Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758161

EP2758161 - COOLED REACTOR FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIMETHYL ETHER FROM METHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75 quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Air Liquide Global E&C Solutions Germany GmbH
Olof-Palme-Strasse 35
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / AHLERS, Bernd
Gartenstrasse 12
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
02 / GIL DE TOBER, Manuela
Launitzstrasse 19
60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / SEIDEL, Eckhard
Inheidener Str. 71
60385 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [2014/41]
Former [2014/31]01 / AHLERS, Bernd
Gartenstrasse 12
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
02 / GIL DE TOBER, Manuela
Launitzstrasse 19
60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / SEIDEL, Eckhard
Wilhelmshöherstrasse 18d
60389 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Representative(s)KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Heine, Christian Klaus
KNH Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date12762264.518.09.2012
WO2012EP68324
Priority number, dateDE20111011422823.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114228
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013041516
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2758161
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J8/04, B01J8/06, C07C41/09, C07C43/04
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:GEKÜHLTER REAKTOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIMETHYLETHER AUS METHANOL[2014/31]
English:COOLED REACTOR FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIMETHYL ETHER FROM METHANOL[2014/31]
French:RÉACTEUR REFROIDI PERMETTANT LA PRODUCTION DE DIMÉTHYLÉTHER À PARTIR DE MÉTHANOL[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
11.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XA]CN2900523Y  (TIANCHENG CARBON ONE CHEMICAL [CN]) [X] 1-5,10 * example 1 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6-9;
 [XA]CN101903323  (JGC CORP; MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraphs [0063] - [0066] - [0073] - [0082] - [0088] , [0141] - [0144] * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2-5;
 [XA]US4058576  (CHANG CLARENCE D ET AL) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 22-44 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 18 * * column 5, lines 33-46 * * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 62 * * figure 1 * [A] 6-10;
 [XA]US4542252  (GRAZIANI KENNETH R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 8, line 28 - column 10, line 25 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5,10;
 [A]WO2011095270  (TOPSOE HALDOR AS [DK]; JUUL DAHL PER [DK]; STAHL HENRIK OTTO [DK]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN101768054  ;
 [A]US2009023958  (JUN KI-WON [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US2012142973  (SU WEI-BIN [TW] ET AL) [XP] 1 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; figures 3,4 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 67, Database accession no. 2010-K12596, XP002693329 & CN101768054 A 20100707 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-10 * abstract *
by applicantUS2014408
 DE3817816
    - FARSI ET AL., "Modeling and Optimization of MeOH to DME Isothermal Fixed-bed Reactor", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL REACTOR ENGINEERING, (2010), vol. 8