Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751309

EP2751309 - SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING A CRYSTALLINE MATERIAL BY DIRECTIONAL CRYSTALLIZATION PROVIDED WITH AN ADDITIONAL LATERAL HEAT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Immeuble "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / GARANDET, Jean-Paul
Les Acacias
139 impasse des Prés
F-73370 Le Bourget du Lac / FR
02 / JOUINI, Anis
247 rue Michel Simon
F-73000 Chambéry / FR
03 / PELLETIER, David
Parc ST Michel - Bâtiment C n°302
28 rue Jean Claude Jacquier
F-73490 La Ravoire / FR
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Talbot, Alexandre , et al
Cabinet Hecké
28 Cours Jean Jaurès
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Talbot, Alexandre , et al
Cabinet Hecké
Europole
10, rue d'Arménie - BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date12762324.731.08.2012
WO2012FR00346
Priority number, dateFR2011000264431.08.2011         Original published format: FR 1102644
[2014/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013030470
Date:07.03.2013
Language:FR
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751309
Date:09.07.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C30B11/00, C30B35/00, C30B28/06, C01B33/02, H01L31/00, C30B33/02
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KRISTALLINEN MATERIALS DURCH GERICHTETE KRISTALLISATION MIT EINER ZUSÄTZLICHEN SEITLICHEN WÄRMEQUELLE[2014/28]
English:SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING A CRYSTALLINE MATERIAL BY DIRECTIONAL CRYSTALLIZATION PROVIDED WITH AN ADDITIONAL LATERAL HEAT SOURCE[2014/28]
French:SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU CRISTALLIN PAR CRISTALLISATION DIRIGÉE MUNI D'UNE SOURCE DE CHALEUR ADDITIONNELLE LATÉRALE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2014National basic fee paid 
28.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedApplication refused, date of legal effect [2018/26]
28.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
06.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [ N /P ]
21.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/08]
21.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [ N /P ]
17.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/08]
17.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26]
Appeal following examination22.03.2018Appeal received No.  T1721/18
22.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009014961  (BP CORP NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061]; figure 8 *;
 [X]US2010148403  (STODDARD NATHAN G [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075]; figures 6A, 6B *
by applicantWO2009014961
 US2010148403