Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2691863

EP2691863 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FeliCa Networks, Inc.
1-11-1 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
[2014/06]
Inventor(s)01 / OCHI, Haruna
c/o FELICA NETWORKS INC.
West Tower 16F Gate City Osaki
1-11-1 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
02 / HANAKI, Naofumi
c/o FELICA NETWORKS INC.
West Tower 16F Gate City Osaki
1-11-1 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
03 / KATO, Shinichi
c/o FELICA NETWORKS INC.
West Tower 16F Gate City Osaki
1-11-1 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
04 / WATANABE, Keitarou
c/o FELICA NETWORKS INC.
West Tower 16F Gate City Osaki
1-11-1 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0032 / JP
 [2014/06]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/06]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12764470.623.03.2012
WO2012JP02050
Priority number, dateJP2011007746831.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011077468
[2014/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012132375
Date:04.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2691863
Date:05.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/00, G06F3/048, G06F9/445, G06F3/0484, H04M1/725, H04W4/00, G06F17/30, G06F9/54
[2014/47]
Former International [2014/06]G06F13/00, G06F3/048, G06F9/445
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/06]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG[2014/06]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/06]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME CORRESPONDANT[2014/06]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2013National basic fee paid 
12.09.2013Search fee paid 
12.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
10.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination09.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0619/17
08.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010076833  (NELSEN DAVID A [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0 52] , [0 53] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0078] *;
 [I]  - "Nexus One User's Guide", (20101015), page 1-9, 241-248,297-330, URL: http://support.t-mobile.com/servlet/JiveServlet/previewBody/1938-102-1-2590/User+manual+-+Google+Nexus+One.pdf, (20120417), XP055024684 [I] 1-15 * page 297 - page 305 * * page 331 - page 332 *
 [I]  - Android Central, "How to use the Android Market", (20100606), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=DBeZzglrj6E, (20141007), XP054975541 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - APPLE INC., "iPod touch User Guide For iPhone OS 3.0 Software", IPOD TOUCH USER GUIDE FOR IPHONE OS 3.0 SOFTWARE, (2009), pages 20 - 21, XP055142951 [I] 1-15 * page 55 - page 60 *
 [A]  - Suchi Amalapurapu, "Apps on SD Card: The Details | Android Developers Blog", (20100709), URL: http://android-developers.blogspot.nl/2010/07/apps-on-sd-card-details.html, (20141007), XP055144689 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2007206893  (DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO.,LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011041019  (FELICA NETWORKS, INC.);
 [Y]JP2004110759  (TOKYU CORP.);
 [A]JP2010218028  (NTT DOCOMO, INC.)