Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2688764

EP2688764 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING DRIVER ALERTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.03.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TK Holdings Inc.
2500 Takata Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
[2014/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAMP, Gregory Gerhard
26810 Trebor Court
South Lyon, Michigan 48178 / US
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/05]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12765209.723.03.2012
WO2012US30336
Priority number, dateUS201161467849P25.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161467849 P
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012135018
Date:04.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2688764
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60K28/06, B60W50/14, A61B5/18, G06K9/00
[2014/46]
Former International [2014/05]B60K28/06, B60W50/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER WACHSAMKEIT EINES FAHRERS[2014/05]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING DRIVER ALERTNESS[2014/05]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LA VIGILANCE D'UN CONDUCTEUR[2014/05]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2013National basic fee paid 
17.10.2013Search fee paid 
17.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/05]
29.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2017
19.09.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0509/18
12.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201403   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6927694  (SMITH RAYMOND PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0228] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0206] - paragraph [0208] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0159] * [Y] 2,3,8,9,12 [I] 15;
 [Y]WO2009060172  (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [Y] 3,9,12 * the whole document * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraphs 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5689241  (CLARKE SR JAMES RUSSELL [US], et al) [Y] 2,8 * column 6, lines 40-45 *;
 [A]US2005226472  (KOMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 3,6,14 * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0070] *
International search[X]US6927694  (SMITH RAYMOND PAUL [US], et al);
 [Y]EP1610278  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]);
 [Y]WO2009138828  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]US5689241  (CLARKE SR JAMES RUSSELL [US], et al)