Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695710

EP2695710 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED WOOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2016
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borisov, Yurii Vladimirovich
Ul. Tbilisskaia 29-42
Perm 614022 / RU
For all designated states
Yusupov, Vadim Faritovich
Ul. Serebryannyi proezd 3-71
Perm 614067 / RU
For all designated states
Babin, Vladislav Gennadievich
D. Eremichi
Ilinskii raion, Permskii krai 617028 / RU
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Jeck, Anton
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Jeck, Anton
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date12765627.028.03.2012
[2015/44]
WO2012RU00226
Priority number, dateRU2011011257301.04.2011         Original published format: RU 2011112573
[2014/07]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012134353
Date:04.10.2012
Language:RU
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695710
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2695710
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU04.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B27K3/08, B27K5/04, B26B7/00, B01J19/00, B01J19/10, B01J19/14, F26B5/02, B27K5/00, F26B5/00, B27K3/02, // E01B3/02
[2015/05]
Former International [2014/07]B27K3/08, B27K5/04, B26B7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEM HOLZ UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2014/07]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING MODIFIED WOOD AND DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD[2014/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BOIS MODIFIÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER CE PROCÉDÉ[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase15.10.2013Translation filed 
04.11.2013National basic fee paid 
04.11.2013Search fee paid 
04.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
04.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
10.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2015Fee for grant paid
15.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2015
Opposition(s)29.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2012
AL28.10.2015
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU28.03.2012
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU28.03.2012
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU28.03.2012
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU28.03.2012
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/10]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/08]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
GB28.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
LU28.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES28.10.2015
IT28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008118033  (STATE HIGHER EDUCATIONAL PROFE [RU]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 10; examples 1-2; table . *
International search[A]RU2391202
 [A]RU2157314
 [A]RU50289U
 [A]WO2008085080
by applicant US4366627
  RU2391202