blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2692546

EP2692546 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 08.04.2020  [2020/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2016/39]
Former [2014/06]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJITA, Shungo
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
10-1 Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2014/06]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/39]Oxley, Robin John George, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2014/30]Oxley, Robin John George, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2014/06]Waldren, Robin Michael
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date12765848.228.03.2012
[2016/39]
WO2012JP58193
Priority number, dateJP2011007086328.03.2011         Original published format: JP 2011070863
[2014/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012133559
Date:04.10.2012
Language:JA
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2692546
Date:05.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2692546
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:B60C11/11, B60C11/12, B60C11/03
[2015/23]
CPC:
B60C11/0302 (EP,US); B60C11/03 (US); B60C11/11 (US);
B60C11/1236 (EP,US); B60C11/12 (EP,US); B60C2011/0344 (EP,US);
B60C2011/0372 (EP,US); B60C2011/0374 (EP,US); B60C2011/0381 (EP,US);
B60C2011/1209 (EP,US); B60C2011/1213 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/06]B60C11/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN[2014/06]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE[2014/06]
French:PNEUMATIQUE[2014/06]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2013Translation filed 
07.10.2013National basic fee paid 
07.10.2013Search fee paid 
07.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2016Fee for grant paid
18.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2012
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
TR28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2020/15]
Former [2019/51]HU28.03.2012
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/46]HU28.03.2012
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU28.03.2012
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
MT28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
GB28.03.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH04274907  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]JPH05319023  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0841198  (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1,4 * figure -; claim - *;
 [E]EP2450199  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [E] 1* figure 1; claim - *
International search[X]JPH04274907  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND);
 [Y]JPH05319023  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [Y]JPH1191317  (BRIDGESTONE CORP)
by applicantJP2004306906
 JP4283783B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.