Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2761168

EP2761168 - BLADE CONNECTION FOR WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LV, RS
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innolith Assets AG
Hirzbodenweg 95
4052 Basel / CH
[2019/17]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Alevo International, S.A.
Rue des Finettes 110
1920 Martigny / CH
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Sway Turbine AS
C. Sundts gate 51
5004 Bergen / NO
Inventor(s)01 / BORGEN, Eystein
Vestre Storheilia 5
N-5239 Rådal / NO
02 / CARRON, William
Apeltunhaugane 183
C6
N-5239 Rådal / NO
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Durm Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Moltkestrasse 45
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[2019/21]
Former [2014/45]Guardian IP Consulting I/S
Diplomvej, Building 381
2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK
Former [2014/32]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Rued Langgaards Vej 8
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Application number, filing date12766077.726.09.2012
[2019/21]
WO2012EP68924
Priority number, dateGB2011001654026.09.2011         Original published format: GB 201116540
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013045472
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2761168
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2761168
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:F03D80/70, F03D1/06
[2016/50]
Former International [2014/32]F03D1/06, F03D11/00, H02K7/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
Former [2014/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHAUFELVERBINDUNG FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE[2014/32]
English:BLADE CONNECTION FOR WIND TURBINE[2014/32]
French:RACCORD DE PALE POUR ÉOLIENNE[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2014National basic fee paid 
25.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
23.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2017Fee for grant paid
09.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Stay/Interruption28.04.2014Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2017/14]
01.03.2019Resumption of proceedings[2019/04]
28.04.2014Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2019/04]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
LV22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
RS22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
GR23.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/49]AL22.05.2019
ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
HR22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NL22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
SE22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
PT22.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
LT22.05.2019
NO22.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2010040829  (SWAY AS [NO]; BORGEN EYSTEIN [NO]; CARRON WILLIAM [NO]; WEST MARK [NO]) [AD] 1-21 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 21 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 8; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US2007024060  (BACON C R [US] BACON C RICHARD [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0 30]; figures 2, 4, 7, 9 *;
 [A]EP2045464  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0022]; figure 2 *
by applicantWO2010040829