Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753533

EP2753533 - DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstraße 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG
Guerickestr. 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2018/38]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH
Sieboldstraße 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestraße 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RANDLER, Martin
Säntisweg 15
88090 Immenstaad / DE
02 / GREWE, Ralph
Friedrichshafener Straße 56
88131 Lindau / DE
03 / FISCHER, Marc
Seerosenweg 6
88149 Nonnenhorn / DE
04 / ULBRICHT, Dirk
Akazienweg 6
88239 Wangen / DE
05 / ECKERT, Alfred
Lion-Feuchtwanger Str. 137
55129 Mainz-Hechtsheim / DE
06 / BAYER, Ronald
Schubertstr. 6
63165 Mühlheim/Main / DE
07 / LÜKE, Stefan
Errlichspfad 7
61191 Rosbach vor der Höhe / DE
08 / PILLER, Bernd
Tulpenstr. 12
63303 Dreieich / DE
09 / HALASY-WIMMER, Georg
Zeppelinstrasse 29
71665 Vaihingen / DE
 [2015/32]
Former [2014/29]01 / RANDLER, Martin
Säntisweg 15
88090 Immenstaad / DE
02 / GREWE, Ralph
Friedrichshafener Straße 56
88131 Lindau / DE
03 / FISCHER, Marc
Seerosenweg 6
88149 Nonnenhorn / DE
04 / ULBRICHT, Dirk
Akazienweg 6
88239 Wangen / DE
05 / ECKERT, Alfred
Lion-Feuchtwanger Str. 137
55129 Mainz-Hechtsheim / DE
06 / BAYER, Ronald
Schubertstr. 6
63165 Mühlheim/Main / DE
07 / LÜKE, Stefan
Am Oberen Stötchen 5
57462 Olpe / DE
08 / PILLER, Bernd
Tulpenstr. 12
63303 Dreieich / DE
09 / HALASY-WIMMER, Georg
Zeppelinstrasse 29
71665 Vaihingen / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Büchner, Jörg
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Intellectual Property
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date12766377.121.08.2012
[2015/48]
WO2012DE100245
Priority number, dateDE20111011257808.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011112578
[2014/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013034141
Date:14.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753533
Date:16.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2753533
Date:25.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B62D15/02, B60T7/12, G08G1/16, G06K9/00, B60R21/015, B60R16/00, B60T7/22, B60W30/06, B60W30/18, B60W50/00
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/29]B62D15/02, B60T7/12, G08G1/16, G06K9/00, B60R21/015
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG DER STELLUNG VON BAUELEMENTEN EINES FAHRZEUGS[2014/29]
English:DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS OF A VEHICLE[2014/29]
French:DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION D'ÉLÉMENTS STRUCTURAUX D'UN VÉHICULE[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2014National basic fee paid 
08.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2015Fee for grant paid
06.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.08.2016   
Connaught Electronics Ltd.
Dunmore Road
Tuam, County Galway / IE
Opponent's representative
Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 [2016/38]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
06.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.04.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition11.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1482/18
10.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.08.2012
AL25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
AT21.08.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/46]HU21.08.2012
AL25.11.2015
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/45]HU21.08.2012
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
TR25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU21.08.2012
BG25.11.2015
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/31]HU21.08.2012
CY25.11.2015
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
MT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU21.08.2012
CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
MK25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
IE21.08.2016
LU21.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/23]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
MC25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
BE31.08.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SI25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ25.11.2015
DK25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
SM25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ25.11.2015
EE25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
IT25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RO25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
SK25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ25.11.2015
ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/25]ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
LV25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/24]ES25.11.2015
FI25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
PL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
GR26.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
PT25.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES25.11.2015
HR25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
RS25.11.2015
SE25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NL25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
IS25.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
NO25.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES25.11.2015
LT25.11.2015
Cited inOppositionDE102007017038
 EP1157890
 DE60306614T