blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2750742 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2750742



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 146
15.11.2017 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.11.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
30.10.2017 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
17.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
10.12.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
10.12.2014 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 10
25.11.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.04.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
26.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
28.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
10.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.04.2013 Republication of A1/A2 Pamphlet -amended claims and/or statement Search / examination 3
27.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
07.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
31.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
31.08.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
31.08.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
31.08.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 12
31.08.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4