blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2750742


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.11.2017 Withdrawal of application published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
06.10.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.08.2017 First examination report
30.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
26.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
06.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
02.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
01.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication