blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2750742 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280053939 EP12766603



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014236104Global Dossier 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014527446Global Dossier 16.10.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103917264Global Dossier 09.07.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2750742Global Dossier 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014004746 21.03.2017A2
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2846474 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2014111825 27.10.2015A
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
WO2012EP66945 31.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013030327Global Dossier 25.04.2013A4
WO2013030327 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102011112021 24.10.2013B4
DE102011112021 28.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011112021 31.08.2011