Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750742

EP2750742 - CANNULA THAT REDUCES PUNCTURE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.12.2017  [2017/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haindl, Hans
Georgsplatz 1
30974 Wennigsen / DE
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12766603.031.08.2012
WO2012EP66945
Priority number, dateDE20111011202131.08.2011         Original published format: DE102011112021
[2014/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013030327
Date:07.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750742
Date:09.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:STANZARME KANÜLE[2014/28]
English:CANNULA THAT REDUCES PUNCTURE PARTICLES[2014/28]
French:AIGUILLE À FAIBLE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES DE COUPE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2014National basic fee paid 
26.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
17.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/50]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1297856  (JAPAN CO LTD DR [JP]) [X] 1,11 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-10,12-17;
 [Y]WO03039633  (MERIDIAN MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [Y] 2-10,12-17 * figures 11-18 *;
 [XDY]WO9205816  (SULZER AG [CH]) [XD] 1,11 * figure 2A * [Y] 2-10,12-17;
 [XY]WO2006106880  (NIPRO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * figure 3 * [Y] 2-10,12-17;
 [XY]DE10224101  (MUENNERSTAEDTER GLASWARENFABRI [DE]) [X] 1,11 * figures 5-8 * [Y] 2-10,12-17;
 [XY]DE3919666  (DOTTERWEICH HANS) [X] 1,11 * figure 2 * [Y] 2-10,12-17;
 [XY]US4721506  (TEVES LEONIDES Y [US]) [X] 1,11 * figures 3,4 * [Y] 2-10,12-17
by applicantUS2746454
 EP0301246
 DE4226476
 EP0443630
 WO9403223
 EP0755690
 DE4101231
 WO9205816
 EP1036571
    - MÜLLER; ZIERSKI, KLINISCHE WOCHENSCHR., (1988), vol. 66, pages 963 - 969,