Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2764709

EP2764709 - INTERPOLATION CIRCUIT FOR INTERPOLATING A FIRST AND A SECOND MICROPHONE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH
Floriansmühlstrasse 60
80939 München / DE
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / WEITNAUER, Michael
Konradinstraße 29
81543 München / DE
02 / MEIER, Michael
Schäufeleinstraße 18
80687 München / DE
03 / GROH, Jens
Tengstraße 39
80796 München / DE
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Baroni, Matteo , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l.
Foro Buonaparte, 51
20121 Milano / IT
[2014/33]
Application number, filing date12768871.105.10.2012
[2016/33]
WO2012EP69799
Priority number, dateIT2011TO0089005.10.2011         Original published format: IT TO20110890
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013050575
Date:11.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2764709
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2764709
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04R3/00, H04R5/027
[2015/46]
Former International [2014/33]H04R3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERPOLATIONSSCHALTUNG ZUM INTERPOLIEREN EINES ERSTEN UND ZWEITEN MIKROFONSIGNALS.[2015/48]
English:INTERPOLATION CIRCUIT FOR INTERPOLATING A FIRST AND A SECOND MICROPHONE SIGNAL[2014/33]
French:CIRCUIT D'INTERPOLATION POUR INTERPOLER UN PREMIER ET UN DEUXIEME SIGNAL MICROPHONIQUE.[2015/48]
Former [2014/33]INTERPOLATIONSSCHALTUNG ZUR INTERPOLATION EINES ERSTEN UND EINES ZWEITEN MIKROFONSIGNALS
Former [2014/33]CIRCUIT D'INTERPOLATION DESTINÉ À INTERPOLER UN PREMIER ET UN SECOND SIGNAL DE MICROPHONE
Entry into regional phase02.04.2014National basic fee paid 
02.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
19.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2016Fee for grant paid
05.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2015
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.10.2012
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE05.10.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU05.10.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE05.10.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/31]HU05.10.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE05.10.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU05.10.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE05.10.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE05.10.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
LU05.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/35]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004076301  (ALGAZI V RALPH [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 72] - [0079] - [0 94] , [ 120]; figures 4-9 * [I] 2,3,7-9,13;
 [A]DE102009052992  (INST RUNDFUNKTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figures 1,5 *
by applicantWO2011057922