Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2709613

EP2709613 - METHODS FOR TREATING HCV [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2017New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[2014/40]
Former [2014/17]For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Former [2014/13]For all designated states
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RAY, Adrian S.
c/o Gilead Pharmasset LLC
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
02 / WATKINS, William J.
c/o Gilead Pharmasset LLC
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
03 / LINK, John O.
c/o Gilead Pharmasset LLC
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
04 / OLDACH, David W.
9111 Laurel Springs Drive
Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US
05 / DELANEY, IV, William E.
c/o Gilead Pharmasset LLC
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, California 94404 / US
 [2014/17]
Former [2014/13]01 / RAY, Adrian S.
19 Pilot Circle
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
02 / WATKINS, William J.
14275 Hilltop Way
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
03 / LINK, John O.
74 Prospect Avenue
San Francisco, California 94110 / US
04 / OLDACH, David W.
9111 Laurel Springs Drive
Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US
05 / DELANEY, IV, William E.
764 Crane Avenue
Foster City, California 94404 / US
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2014/13]Bond, Christopher William
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date12768967.714.09.2012
WO2012US55621
Priority number, dateUS201161535885P16.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161535885 P
US201161561753P18.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161561753 P
[2014/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013040492
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2709613
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search reportEP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/381, A61K31/4184, A61K31/4196, A61K31/513, A61P31/14
[2014/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/13]
Extension statesBA19.12.2013
ME19.12.2013
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HCV[2014/13]
English:METHODS FOR TREATING HCV[2014/13]
French:PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LE VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE C (HCV)[2014/13]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2013National basic fee paid 
19.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/13]
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2011178129  (CANALES EDA [US], et al) [I] 1,2,10,11,15,16,19-21,24,33-37 * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0204]; claim 20 * [Y] 1-24,31,38,42,43,45,46;
 [YP]US2011306541  (DELANEY IV WILLIAM E [US], et al) [YP] 1-24,31-38,42,43,45,46 * paragraph [0074]; claim 17; table 1 *;
 [YP]WO2012087596  (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-24,31-38,42,43,45,46 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]  - E. MURAKAMI ET AL, "Mechanism of Activation of PSI-7851 and Its Diastereoisomer PSI-7977", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100826), vol. 285, no. 45, doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.161802, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 34337 - 34347, XP055004551 [A] 1-46 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.161802
by applicantUS7964580
 US2010298257
 US2010081628
 US2011015146
 US7429572
 EP0093401
 US7754720
 US2010051763
 US2009257978
 WO2007056170
 US2010310512
    - S. P. PARKER,, McGraw-Hill Dictionary of Chemical Terms, MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1984),
    - ELIEL, E.; WILEN, S., Stereochemistry of Organic Compounds, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994),
    - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, (1986),
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO.,
    - J.O.C., (2004), page 6257,
    - TALIANI M; BIANCHI E; NARJES F; FOSSATELLI M; URBANI A; STEINKUHLER C ET AL., "A continuous assay of hepatitis C virus protease based on resonance energy transfer depsipeptide substrates", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 240, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/abio.1996.0331, pages 60 - 7, XP001154533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.0331
    - DELANEY, W.E. ET AL., ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS CHEMOTHERAPY, (2001), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 1705 - 1713,
    - PRICHARD MN; ASELTINE KR; SHIPMAN C, JR., MacSynergyTM II, UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, (1993),
    - PRICHARD M.N.; SHIPMAN C., JR., ANTIVIRAL RES, (1990), vol. 14, no. 4-5, pages 181 - 205,
    - PRICHARD M.N.; SHIPMAN C, JR., ANTIVIR THER, (1996), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 9 - 20,
    - PRICHARD M.N. ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (1993), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 540 - 5,
    - FRIEBE ET AL., J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, no. 24, pages 12047 - 57,
    - ROBINSON M; YANG H; SUN SC; PENG B; TIAN Y; PAGRATIS N ET AL., "Novel HCV Reporter Replicon Cell Lines Enable Efficient Antiviral Screening against Genotype 1a", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2010),
    - HERLIHY ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2008), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 3523 - 31,
    - LOHMANN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, no. 5424, pages 110 - 3,
 US20090632194