EP2759171 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL DISCOVERY IN COGNITIVE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BARBIERI, Alan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
PRAKASH, Rajat 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/31] | Application number, filing date | 12768978.4 | 18.09.2012 | [2017/15] | WO2012US55946 | Priority number, date | US201161536508P | 19.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161536508 P | US201213621758 | 17.09.2012 Original published format: US201213621758 | [2014/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013043617 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2759171 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2759171 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KANALERKENNUNG IN EINEM KOGNITIVEN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2014/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL DISCOVERY IN COGNITIVE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS | [2014/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCOUVERTE DE CANAL DANS DES RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS COGNITIVES | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 10.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2012 | AL | 12.04.2017 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | IE | 18.09.2017 | LU | 18.09.2017 | MT | 18.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.09.2012 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
MT | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 18.09.2017 | ||
LU | 18.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010088586 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,9,12,13,17,21 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] ** figures 2, 3, 4 *; | [XY]WO2010111150 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 31,35,39 * paragraphs [0046] , [0051] , [0053] , [0057] , [0060] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0185] * * figures 1, 27 * [Y] 1-30,32-34,36-38,40-42; | [Y]US2010296429 (HAN SEUNG HEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-30,32-34,36-38,40-42 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0037] , [0040] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0134] * * figures 18, 19 *; | [A] - "Reconfigurable Radio Systems (RRS); Use Cases for Operation in White Space Frequency Bands", ETSI DRAFT; 01004V017, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110912), no. V0.1.7, pages 1 - 60, XP014067100 [A] 1-42 * page 14, paragraph 5.2.4 - page 15, paragraph 5.2.4 * * page 17, paragraph 5.2.4.3 - page 18, paragraph 5.2.4.3 * * page 49, paragraph 5.8.3 - page 51, paragraph 5.8.4 * * figures 6, 9, 39, 40 * | Examination | WO2011106538 |