Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758861

EP2758861 - STORAGE DRIVE VIRTUALIZATION IN A DATA STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Technology, Inc.
170 W. Tasman Drive
San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHTALA, Satya
11522 Country Spring Court
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / CAFIERO, Luca
1731 Fulton Street
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/31]
Application number, filing date12769236.613.09.2012
WO2012US55083
Priority number, dateUS20111320028122.09.2011         Original published format: US201113200281
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013043457
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758861
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06, H04L29/06
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERLAUFWERKVIRTUALISIERUNG IN EINEM DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM[2014/31]
English:STORAGE DRIVE VIRTUALIZATION IN A DATA STORAGE SYSTEM[2014/31]
French:VIRTUALISATION D'UN LECTEUR DE STOCKAGE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
14.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination30.05.2017Appeal received No.  T2147/17
26.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010293349  (LIONETTI CHRIS [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0042] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] * * figure 4 *;
 [I]US2008270564  (RANGEGOWDA DHARSHAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0018] - [0027] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2003191840  (MACIEL FREDERICO BUCHHOLZ [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] * * figures 1,16 *