Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2764157

EP2764157 - PAPERMAKING FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Andritz Kufferath GmbH
Lommessemstr. 32-36
52353 Düren / DE
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / HEGER, Wolfgang
Im Niederbusch 2G
52385 Nideggen / DE
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/09]Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Former [2014/33]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12769344.806.09.2012
[2016/09]
WO2012EP67456
Priority number, dateDE2011105416304.10.2011         Original published format: DE102011054163
[2014/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013050215
Date:11.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2764157
Date:13.08.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2764157
Date:02.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/00, D03D11/00
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAPIERMASCHINENSIEB[2014/33]
English:PAPERMAKING FABRIC[2014/33]
French:TOILE POUR MACHINE A PAPIER[2014/33]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2014National basic fee paid 
20.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
05.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2015Fee for grant paid
18.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.08.2015
Opposition(s)05.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.09.2012
AL02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
MT02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU06.09.2012
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
MT02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU06.09.2012
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
Former [2017/41]CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
IE06.09.2016
LU06.09.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2017/16]CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/48]HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/39]HR02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
RS02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
Former [2016/35]HR02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3224236  (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantCA1115177
 DE3928484
 DE4229828
 WO9300472
 EP0136284
 EP0097966
 EP0794283
 WO9906630
 WO9906632
 WO0214601
 EP0069101
 EP0093096