EP2774382 - METHOD AND MULTIMEDIA UNIT FOR PROCESSING A DIGITAL BROADCAST TRANSPORT STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22-24, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. Route de Genève 22-24 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENDLING, Bertrand Chemin des Aranyes 239a 01220 Divonne-les Bains / FR | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 12769428.9 | 05.10.2012 | WO2012EP69693 | Priority number, date | EP20110187260 | 31.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11187260 | US201161553271P | 31.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161553271 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013064325 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774382 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/437, H04N21/258, H04N21/266, H04N21/6377, H04N21/418, H04N21/61 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H04N21/25816 (EP,US);
H04N21/43853 (KR);
H04N21/2347 (US);
H04H60/23 (KR);
H04N21/235 (KR);
H04N21/23614 (KR);
H04N21/2368 (KR);
H04N21/26609 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4353 (US);
H04N21/437 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MULTIMEDIAEINHEIT ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES DIGITALEN RUNDFUNKTRANSPORTSTROMS | [2014/37] | English: | METHOD AND MULTIMEDIA UNIT FOR PROCESSING A DIGITAL BROADCAST TRANSPORT STREAM | [2014/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET UNITÉ MULTIMÉDIA POUR TRAITER UN FLUX DE TRANSPORT DE DIFFUSION NUMÉRIQUE | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 03.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2017 | 31.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Appeal following examination | 07.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2551/17 | 07.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.09.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006020786 (HELMS WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0042] - [0050] *; | [XI]US2008301437 (CHEVALLIER ANTHONY [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,11,19 * paragraphs [0079] , [0 84] - [0087] - [0102] , [0104] , [ 137] - [0143]; figure 7 * [I] 3-10,12-18; | [I]FR2954875 (VIACCESS SA [FR]) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0037] - [0074] - [0077]; figures 1,3 * |