Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756595

EP2756595 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROTOR ANGLE OF A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE AND DRIVE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.10.2018
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2018Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG
Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42
76646 Bruchsal / DE
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / WOLF, Harald
Nikolausplatz 18
76698 Ubstadt-Weiher / DE
02 / HAMMEL, Wolfgang
Silberhölle 59
76646 Bruschsal / DE
 [2014/30]
Application number, filing date12769601.110.09.2012
WO2012EP03793
Priority number, dateDE20111011333715.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011113337
[2014/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013037472
Date:21.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2756595
Date:23.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02P21/14, H02P6/18, G06Q10/04, H02P6/185, H02P21/18
[2018/23]
Former International [2014/30]H02P21/14, H02P6/18, G06Q10/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DES ROTORWINKELS EINER SYNCHRONMASCHINE UND ANTRIEB ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2014/30]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE ROTOR ANGLE OF A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE AND DRIVE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD[2014/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ANGLE DU ROTOR D'UNE MACHINE SYNCHRONE ET SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCÉDÉ[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase15.04.2014National basic fee paid 
15.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
14.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]DE10226974  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,15 * abstract * * figures 2, 5, 6, 7 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0051] * * claims 1-7 * [A] 9-14 [Y] 6,7 [I] 3;
 [X]WO2011026578  (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 3 * * page 7, line 1 - page 11, line 10 *
 [X]  - WOLFGANG HAMMEL ET AL, "Position sensorless control of PMSM by synchronous injection and demodulation of alternating carrier voltage", SENSORLESS CONTROL FOR ELECTRICAL DRIVES (SLED), 2010 FIRST SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100709), ISBN 978-1-4244-7035-8, pages 56 - 63, XP031728017 [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * * Kapiteln I, IV, V und VI * * figures 1, 5, 6 * * table 2 *
 [XP]  - WOLFGANG HAMMEL ET AL, "High-resolution sensorless position estimation using delta-sigma-modulated current measurement", ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION (ECCE), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20110917), doi:10.1109/ECCE.2011.6064133, ISBN 978-1-4577-0542-7, pages 2717 - 2724, XP032067527 [XP] 9-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECCE.2011.6064133
 [YA]  - WILHELM PETERS ET AL, "Regular-sampled current measurement in AC drives using delta-sigma modulators", 13TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS, 2009 : EPE '09 ; 8 - 10 SEPT. 2009, BARCELONA, SPAIN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090908), ISBN 978-1-4244-4432-8, pages 1 - 9, XP031541731 [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * figures 1, 4, 19, 20 * * Kapiteln 1, 2, 4, 5 * [A] 9-14
by applicantUS2006091845
    - A. CONSOLI; A. GAETA; G. SCARCELLA; G. SCELBA; A. TESTA, "Qptimization of Transient Operations in Sensorless . Control Techniques Based on Carrier Signal Injection", PROC. IEEE ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS END EXPOSITION, SAN JOSE, (20090920), pages 2115 - 2122
    - A. GAETA; G. SCARCELLA; G. SCELBA; A. TESTA, "Optimization of Transient Operations in Sensorless Control Techniques Based on Carrier Signal Injection", PROC. IEEE ENERGY CONVERSION CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION, SAN JOSE, (20090920), doi:doi:10.1109/ECCE.2009.5316247, pages 2115 - 2122, XP031887726

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECCE.2009.5316247
    - S.C. DUTTA ROY, "Impulse Response of sinc'' FIR Filters", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CLRCUITS AND SYSTEMS-II: EXPRESS BRIEFS, (200603), vol. 53, no. 3, pages 217 - 219