Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2761354

EP2761354 - DISPLAY DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Controls Automotive Electronics SAS
10, Avenue de l'Enterprise
95892 Cergy-Pontoise Cedex / FR
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / GALL, Hugues
114 rue Béthemont
F-78630 Orgeval / FR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Schwöbel, Thilo K. , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2019/08]
Former [2014/32]Schwöbel, Thilo K. , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12770105.001.10.2012
[2019/08]
WO2012EP69369
Priority number, dateDE20111011478501.10.2011         Original published format: DE102011114785
FR2012000074512.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1200745
[2014/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013045705
Date:04.04.2013
Language:FR
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2761354
Date:06.08.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2761354
Date:20.02.2019
Language:FR
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B15/00, B60K35/00, G09G5/00, G02B27/01
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, IM BESONDEREN FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2014/32]
English:DISPLAY DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE[2014/32]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2014National basic fee paid 
02.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
25.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2019Fee for grant paid
07.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]JP2003175744  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,3,5,7-9 * abstract * [I] 2,4;
 [X]US2009160736  (SHIKITA KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0026] - [0050]; figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]EP2351544  (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * paragraphs [0061] - [0070] - [0145] - [0151]; figures 1,15a,15b,18 * [I] 2,4;
 [XI]JP2001343929  (CANON KK) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * abstract * [I] 2,4,9
by applicantUS5214413
 WO2007090824