Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748147

EP2748147 - SUBSTITUTED 2-ALKYL-1-OXO-N-PHENYL-3-HETEROARYL-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE-4-CARBOXAMIDES FOR ANTIMALARIAL THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Children's Research Hospital
262 Danny Thomas Place
Memphis, TN 38105 / US
For all designated states
MMV Medicines for Malaria Venture
20 route de Pré-Bois, ICC
1215 Geneva / CH
For all designated states
Rutgers, The State University Of New Jersey
New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901-1281 / US
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / GUY, Rodney Kiplin
73 Riverwalk Place
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
02 / ZHU, Fangyi
50 Hannibal Cove Apt. 318
Memphis, Tennessee 38103 / US
03 / GUIGUEMDE, Wendyam Armand
271 North Lauderdale Street Apt. 106
Memphis, Tennessee 38105 / US
04 / FLOYD, David
4 Harbourton Ridge Drive
Pennington, New Jersey 08534 / US
05 / KNAPP, Spencer
43 Hollow Road
Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US
06 / STEIN, Philip
3 Harbourton Ridge Drive
Pennington, New Jersey 08534 / US
07 / CASTRO, Steve
20 Donna Drive
East Hannover, New Jersey 07936 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)reuteler & cie SA
Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29
1260 Nyon / CH
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date12772470.624.08.2012
[2017/31]
WO2012IB54305
Priority number, dateUS201161527594P25.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161527594 P
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013027196
Date:28.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748147
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2748147
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D409/04, A61K31/4725, A61K31/506, C07D417/04, C07D401/04
[2017/11]
Former International [2014/27]C07D217/26, C07D401/04, C07D405/04, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/47, A61P33/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBA21.03.2014
ME21.03.2014
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 2-ALKYL-1-OXO-N-PHENYL-3-HETEROARYL-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROISOCHINOLIN-4-CARBOXAMIDE FÜR ANTIMALARIA-THERAPIEN[2014/27]
English:SUBSTITUTED 2-ALKYL-1-OXO-N-PHENYL-3-HETEROARYL-1,2,3,4-TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE-4-CARBOXAMIDES FOR ANTIMALARIAL THERAPIES[2014/27]
French:2-ALKYL-1-OXO-N-PHÉNYL-3-HÉTÉROARYL-1,2,3,4-TÉTRAHYDROISOQUINOLÉINE-4-CARBOXAMIDES SUBSTITUÉS POUR THÉRAPIES ANTIPALUDÉENNES[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2014National basic fee paid 
21.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
14.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2017Fee for grant paid
22.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2016
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9521616  (US HEALTH [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006104915  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10312963  (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004022553  (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03044021  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007105989  (IVASHCHENKO ANDREY ALEXANDROVI [RU], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2004004727  (AXYS PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010055164  (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE], et al) [A] 1-24 * compounds C256, C268-C270 *;
 [I]  - GUIGUEMDE, W. A, ET AL., "Chemical genetics of Plasmodium falciparum", NATURE, (20100520), vol. 465, doi:10.1038/nature09099, pages 311 - 315, XP002686411 [I] 1-4,6-12,16,18,19,22-24 * Compound SJ000101247 in Figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE09099
 [A]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060711), Database accession no. RN 891918-34-6, 891918-97-0, URL: STN, XP002686412 [A] 1-24 * RN 891923-28-7, 891923-04-9,891901-26-1 *
 [A]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070420), Database accession no. RN 931315-35-4, XP002686905 [A] 1-24 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20070423), Database accession no. RN 931939-58-1, XP002686906 [A] 1-24 * abstract *
by applicant   - MADRID ET AL., "Synthesis of ring-substituted 4-aminoquinolines and evaluation of their antimalarial activities", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, pages 1015 - 8,
    - T. W. GREENE; P. G. M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1999),
    - ALMARASSON, 0., Crystal Engineering of the Composition of Pharmaceutical Phases. Do Pharmaceutical Co-crystals Represent a New Path to Improved Medicines?, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (2004), pages 1889 - 1896,
    - Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-17,
    - Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5,
    - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-40,
    - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS,
    - Larock's Comprehensive Organic Transformations, VCH PUBLISHERS INC., (1989),
    - The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS, (2012),
    - MALLARI, J. P.; GUIGUEMDE, W. A.; GUY, R. K., "Antimalarial activity of thiosemicarbazones and purine derived nitriles", BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (2009), vol. 19, no. 13, page 3546,
    - MATRAJT, M. ET AL., "Amino-terminal control of transgenic protein expression levels in Toxoplasma gondii", MOL BIOCHEM PARASITOL, (2002), vol. 120, no. 2, page 285,
    - PHILLIPS ET AL., "Triazolopyrimidine-based dihydroorotate dehydrogenase inhibitors with potent and selective activity against the malaria parasite Plasmodium falciparum", J. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 51, no. 12, page 3649,
    - HENAI, B. R. ET AL., "Structure- activity relationships for inhibition of cysteine protease activity and development of Plasmodium falciparum by peptidyl vinyl sulfones", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (2003), vol. 47, no. 1, page 154,
    - HEKMAT-NEJAD, M.; RATHOD, P. K., "Plasmodium falciparum: kinetic interactions of WR99210 with pyrimethamine-sensitive and pyrimethamine-resistant dihydrofolate reductase", EXP. PARASITOL., (1997), vol. 87, no. 3, page 222,
    - SIRAWARAPORN, W. ET AL., "The dihydrofolate reductase domain of Plasmodium falciparum thymidylate synthase-dihydrofolate reductase. Gene synthesis, expression, and anti-folate- resistant mutants", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, no. 29, page 21637,
    - MUI, E. J. ET AL., "Novel triazine JPC-2067-B inhibits Toxoplasma gondii in vitro and in vivo", PLOS NEGL TROP DIS, (2008), vol. 2, no. 3, page E190,
    - KRUNGKRAI, J.; KRUNGKRAI, S. R.; SURAVERATUM, N.; PRAPUNWATTANA, P., "Mitochondrial ubiquinol-cytochrome c reductase and cytochrome c oxidase: chemotherapeutic targets in malarial parasites", BIOCHEM MOL BIOL INT, (1997), vol. 42, no. 5, page 1007,
    - KRUNGKRAI, J., "The multiple roles of the mitochondrion of the malarial parasite.", PARASITOLOGY, (2004), vol. 129, page 511,
    - PAINTER, H. J.; MORRISEY, J. M.; MATHER, M. W.; VAIDYA, A. B., "Specific role of mitochondrial electron transport in blood-stage Plasmodium falciparum", NATURE, (2007), vol. 446, no. 7131, page 88,
    - SMILKSTEIN, M. J. ET AL., "A drug- selected Plasmodium falciparum lacking the need for conventional electron transport", MOL BIOCHEM PARASITOL, (2008), vol. 159, no. 1, page 64,
    - CROWTHER, G. J. ET AL., "Buffer optimization of thermal melt assays of Plasmodium proteins for detection of small-molecule ligands", J. BIOMOL. SCREEN, (2009), vol. 14, no. 6, page 700,
    - KRUNGKRAI, J., "The multiple roles of the mitochondrion of the malarial parasite", PARASITOLOGY, (2004), vol. 129, page 511,
    - ROBERTSON, A. D.; MURPHY, K. P., "Protein Structure and the Energetics of Protein Stability", CHEM REV, (1997), vol. 97, no. 5, page 1251,
    - MATULIS, D.; KRANZ, J. K.; SALEMME, F. R.; TODD, M. J., "Thermodynamic stability of carbonic anhydrase: measurements of binding affinity and stoichiometry using ThermoFluor", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, no. 13, page 5258,
    - JIM£NEZ-DIAZ, M. B. ET AL., "Improvement of detection specificity of Plasmodium-infected murine erythrocytes by flow cytometry using autofluorescence and YOYO-1", CYTOMETRY PART A, (2005), vol. 67, no. 1, page 27,
    - TRAYDAKOV, SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (2011), vol. 41, pages 2430 - 2434,
    - GUIGUEMDE ET AL., NATURE, (2010), vol. 465, pages 311 - 315,