Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748394

EP2748394 - ANTI-THEFT SECURITY DEVICE TO INCREASE MARKETING OPPORTUNITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
07.12.2018Change - applicantpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
207 Goode Avenue
Glendale, CA 91203 / US
[2019/02]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
150 North Orange Grove Bvld.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COOPER, William, J.
c/o Avery Dennison Corporation
150N. Orange Grove Blvd.
Pasadena, CA 91103 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2014/27]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date12772661.028.09.2012
[2019/02]
WO2012US57801
Priority number, dateUS201161541018P29.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161541018 P
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013049492
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748394
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2748394
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05B73/00
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG VON MARKTCHANCEN[2014/27]
English:ANTI-THEFT SECURITY DEVICE TO INCREASE MARKETING OPPORTUNITIES[2014/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ ANTIVOL POUR AUGMENTER LES POSSIBILITÉS DE COMMERCIALISATION[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
25.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.11.2018Fee for grant paid
22.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004016269  (SKJELLERUP JOHAN [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0047] *;
 [A]US2009058659  (HANDYSIDE GRAHAM [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0037], lines 10-13 *;
 [XI]  - NEDAP, "Labels & tags", (20100510), URL: http://www.nedap-retail.com/super/labels-tags-and-accesoires, (20130122), XP002690771 [X] 1-7,9,11-16,19,20 * paragraph [000l] * [I] 8,10,17,18,21,22
 [L]  - Chemco, "EAS Tags & Labels", URL: http://www.chemco.com.sg/electronics/products/eas/eas-tags-labels/, (20130123), XP002690772 [L] 1-22 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0063869