Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2701423

EP2701423 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING INTERFERENCE IN COORDINATED MULTIPOINT TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
China Academy of Telecommunications Technology
No. 40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidian District
Beijing 100191 / CN
[2014/09]
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Qiubin
NO.40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN
02 / CHEN, Wenhong
NO.40 Xueyuan Rd.
Haidian District Beijing 100191 / CN
 [2014/09]
Representative(s)Körfer, Thomas , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/18]
Former [2014/09]Körfer, Thomas , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12773763.328.03.2012
[2018/18]
WO2012CN73199
Priority number, dateCN20111010214922.04.2011         Original published format: CN201110102149
[2014/09]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012142901
Date:26.10.2012
Language:ZH
[2012/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2701423
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2701423
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN26.10.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, // H04B7/024
[2017/48]
Former International [2014/45]H04W24/10
Former International [2014/09]H04W24/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERFERENZMESSUNG IN EINER KOORDINIERTEN MEHRPUNKTÜBERTRAGUNG[2014/09]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING INTERFERENCE IN COORDINATED MULTIPOINT TRANSMISSION[2014/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER DES INTERFÉRENCES DANS UNE TRANSMISSION MULTIPOINT COORDONNÉE[2014/09]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2013Translation filed 
21.11.2013National basic fee paid 
21.11.2013Search fee paid 
21.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/09]
28.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2018Fee for grant paid
22.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2017
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]  - CATT, "Interference Measurement over Muted RE", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-110049, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110111), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dublin, Ireland; 20110117, XP050490028 [X] 1,5,10,13 * sections 2 and 3 * [Y] 1,5,10,13 [I] 2-4,6-9,11,12,14,15
 [Y]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "RE muting design and considerations", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104649 RE MUTING DESIGN AND CONSIDERATIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050449929 [Y] 1,5,10,13 * sections 2 and 3 *
International search[XP]CN102149124  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [Y]CN101848485  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO);
 [Y]CN101227445  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101998453  (ZTE CORP)