EP2898452 - OVERALL EQUIPMENT EFFECTIVENESS OF A ROBOT CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/14] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMMERTZ, Bertil Björkgatan 7 723 46 Västerås / SE | 02 /
ANDERSSON, Henrik Kuskvägen 4 734 94 Strömsholm / SE | [2020/14] |
Former [2015/31] | 01 /
EMMERTZ, Bertil Björkgatan 7 S-723 46 Västerås / SE | ||
02 /
ANDERSSON, Henrik Kuskvägen 4 S-734 94 Strömsholm / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2020/14] |
Former [2015/31] | Savela, Reino Aleksi ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 12774965.3 | 20.09.2012 | [2020/14] | WO2012EP68548 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044311 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898452 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2898452 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,CN,US);
B25J9/1602 (US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/32015 (US);
G05B2219/49071 (US);
Y02P90/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESAMTANLAGENEFFEKTIVITÄT EINER ROBOTERZELLE | [2015/31] | English: | OVERALL EQUIPMENT EFFECTIVENESS OF A ROBOT CELL | [2015/31] | French: | EFFICACITÉ D'ÉQUIPEMENT GLOBAL D'UNE CELLULE DE ROBOT | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2012 | AL | 01.04.2020 | AT | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | NL | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | TR | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 20.09.2020 | IE | 20.09.2020 | LU | 20.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.09.2012 | |
AL | 01.04.2020 | ||
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
TR | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
AT | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002138169 (SAKAGUCHI MITSUO [JP]) [I] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [I]US7379782 (COCCO DENNIS P [CA]) [I] 1-17 * column 1 - column 21, line 8 *; | [A] - KREN LESLIE ET AL, "Using Cycle Time to Measure Performance and Control Costs in Focused Factories", INTERNET CITATION, (2002), pages 1 - 18, URL: https://pantherfile.uwm.edu/lkren/www/cycle%20time.pdf, (20020101), XP008118567 [A] 1-17 * page 1 - page 7 * | [A] - HIROSHI YONEZAWA ET AL, "Long-term operational experience with a robot cell production system controlled by low carbon-footprint Senju (thousand-handed) Kannon Model robots and an approach to improving operating efficiency", AUTOMATION SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING (CASE), 2011 IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110824), doi:10.1109/CASE.2011.6042406, ISBN 978-1-4577-1730-7, pages 291 - 298, XP031975755 [A] 1-17 * page 291 - page 298 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CASE.2011.6042406 |