Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771108

EP2771108 - CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHLORINE BY MEANS OF A GAS-PHASE OXIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covestro Deutschland AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2015/45]
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Timm
Bickhausener Straße 2
41472 Neuss / DE
02 / MOSER, Maximilian
Mühlackerstraße 112
CH-8046 Zürich / CH
03 / MÜLLER, Walther
Iltisweg 8
50259 Pulheim / DE
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Levpat
c/o Covestro AG
Gebäude 4825
51365 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date12775024.819.10.2012
WO2012EP70771
Priority number, dateDE2011108506824.10.2011         Original published format: DE102011085068
[2014/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013060628
Date:02.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771108
Date:03.09.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J21/06, B01J23/10, B01J37/02, C01B7/04
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLOR DURCH GASPHASENOXIDATION[2014/36]
English:CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHLORINE BY MEANS OF A GAS-PHASE OXIDATION[2014/36]
French:CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DU CHLORE PAR OXYDATION CATALYTIQUE EN PHASE GAZEUSE[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2014National basic fee paid 
26.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
29.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.01.2019Request for further processing filed
28.01.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.02.2019Decision despatched
30.03.2015Request for further processing filed
30.03.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.04.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4428994  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-11 * page 2, lines 57-68 * * example 1 (Katalysator C) *;
 [X]EP1369176  (SCHERRER INST PAUL [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8-11 * claims 1,2,5 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] - [0012] - [0017] , [0028] , [0029] *;
 [XDI]DE102009021675  (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,3,4,8-15 * claims 1,3,8-10,13,14 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] - [0014] - [0017] - [0023] , [0026] - [0027] - [0029] - [0031] - [0033] , [0051] - [0053] * [I] 16,17;
 [XD]WO2009035234  (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORPERATION [KR], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,8-13 * claims 1,2,5-7 * * page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 19 *
 [X]  - Anonymous, "NorPro Catalyst Carriers --Typical Properties", (201108), Saint-Gobain Norpro, URL: http://www.norpro.saint-gobain.com/uploadedFiles/SGnorpro/Documents/CatalystCarriers-TypicalProperties-pf.pdf, (20130102), XP002689712 [X] 1-6,8-10 * letzte Seite, Tabelle, Zeile 9 *
 [X]  - ZINAB A OMRAN ET AL, "Ceria-modified zirconia and their effects on the molybdenum oxide dispersion", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (20030101), vol. 77, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0254-0584(02)00170-0, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 704 - 710, XP055048601 [X] 1,3,4,8-11 * 2. Experiment, Zeilen 1-10; page 705 * * 3.1. X-ray-diffraction; page 705 - page 706 * * figure 1 * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0254-0584(02)00170-0
by applicantWO2009035234
 DE1567788
 EP0743277
 US5908607
 EP2026905
 EP2027062
 DE102009021675
 EP1170250
 JP2004099388