Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758032

EP2758032 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CONDITIONS OF COMPROMISED SKIN BARRIER FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shiseido Americas Corporation
900 Third Avenue, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022-4795 / US
[2018/16]
Former [2018/01]For all designated states
Olivo Laboratories, LLC
One Kendall Square
Binney Street
Building 1400
Third Floor, Suite -14302
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Living Proof, Inc.
301 Binney Street, First Floor
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Betty
57 Reservoir Street
Unit 2
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / LOMAKIN, Joseph
140 Huron Avenue
Unit 8
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
03 / KANG, Soo-young
65 Spiers Road
Newton, MA 02459 / US
04 / ADAMS, Benjamin, W.
22 Lowden Avenue 1
Somerville, MA 02144 / US
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12775090.921.09.2012
WO2012US56667
Priority number, dateUS201161537307P21.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161537307 P
US201261607905P07.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261607905 P
US201261607908P07.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261607908 P
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013044098
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758032
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K8/891, A61K47/24, A61P17/02
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
Extension statesBA17.03.2014
ME17.03.2014
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN MIT BEEINTRÄCHTIGTER HAUTBARRIEREFUNKTION[2014/31]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CONDITIONS OF COMPROMISED SKIN BARRIER FUNCTION[2014/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER DES AFFECTIONS DE FONCTION DE BARRIÈRE CUTANÉE COMPROMISE[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2014National basic fee paid 
17.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008159970  (WILLEMIN CLAUDIE [FR]) [X] 1-51 * paragraphs [0182] - [0185] - [0190] - [0192] - [0739] - [0741] * * claims 1-44 *;
 [X]WO2007102859  (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]WO0074738  (GUYURON BAHMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 2, line 23 - line 31 * * page 4, line 19 - page 8, line 30 * * page 9, line 23 - line 32 * * page 15, line 5 - line 11 * * claims 1-20 *;
 [X]WO2007117284  (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-51 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-8 *;
 [X]EP2090294  (COTY DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-51 * claims 1-15 *;
 [X]WO2011001217  (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-51 * claims 1-20 *
by applicant   - HWANG ET AL., INTERNAT. J. DERMATOL., (2001), vol. 40, pages 223 - 231
    - GRAHAME ET AL., CLINICAL SCIENCE, (1970), vol. 39, pages 223 - 238
    - CROLL, S.G., J. COATINGS TECH., (1980), vol. 52, page 35
    - FRANCIS, J MATER SCI, (2002), vol. 37, pages 4717 - 31
    - M. OBATA; H. TAGAMI., "A rapid in vitro test to assess skin moisturizers", J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (19900708), vol. 41, pages 235 - 241
    - P. AGACHE; S. MARY; P. MURET; A.M. MATTA; P. HUMBERT., "Assessment of the Water Content of the Stratum corneum using a Sorption-Desorption Test", DERMATOLOGY, (2001), vol. 202, pages 308 - 313
    - OBATA, M.; TAGAMI, H., "A rapid in vitro test to assess skin moisturizers", J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1990), vol. 41, pages 235 - 241
    - GROVE, G.L.; M.J. GROVE; C. ZERWECK; E. PIERCE, "Comparative metrology of the evaporimeter and the DermaLab@ TEWL probe", SKIN RES. & TECH., (1999), vol. 5, pages 1 - 8
    - GROVE, G.L.; M.J. GROVE; C. ZERWECK; E. PIERCE, "Computerized evaporimetry using the DermaLab@ TEWL probe", SKIN RES. & TECH., (1999), vol. 5, pages 9 - 13
    - PINNAGODA, J.; R.A. TUPKER; T. ANGER; J. SERUP., "Guidelines for transepidermal water loss (TEWL) measurement", CONTACT DERMATITIS, (1990), vol. 22, pages 164 - 178
    - HANNIFIN JM; RAJKA G, "Diagnostic features of atopic dermatitis", ACTA DERM VENEREOL, (1980), vol. 92, pages 44 - 7
    - "Severity scoring of atopic dermatitis: the SCORAD index", DERMATOLOGY, (1993), vol. 186, pages 23 - 31
    - YAMAMOTTO Y, "Measurement and analysis of skin electrical impedence", ACTA DERM VENERO, (1994), vol. 185, pages 34 - 8
    - FINLAY AY; KHAN GK, "Dermatology Life Quality Index(DLQI) - a simple practical measure for routine clinicaluse", CLIN EXP DERMATOL, (1994), vol. 19, pages 210 - 216
    - LEWIS-JONES MS; FINLAY AY, "The Children's DermatologyLife Quality Index (CDLQI): initial validation and practical use", BR J DERMATOL, (1995), vol. 132, pages 942 - 949
    - BASRA MK; FENECH R; GATT RM ET AL., "The Dermatology Life Quality Index 1994-2007: a comprehensive review of validation data and clinical results", BR J DERMATOL, (2008), vol. 159, pages 997 - 1035
    - FREDRIKSSON T; PETTERSSON U., "Severe psoriasis- oral therapy with a new retinoid", DERMATOLOGICA, (1978), vol. 157, pages 238 - 241
    - SONG SP; LV CZ; ZHANG XJ; SHI YJ; ELIAS PM; FEINGOLD KR; MAN MQ, "Decreased cutaneous resonance running time in cured leprosy subjects", SKIN PHARMACOL PHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 22, pages 218 - 224
    - XIN S; MAN W; FLUHR JW; SONG S; ELIAS PM; MAN MQ, "Cutaneous resonance running time varies with age, body site and gender ina normal Chinese population", SKIN RES TECHNOL, (2010), vol. 16, pages 413 - 421
    - LEUNG DY; BIEBER T., "Atopic dermatitis", LANCET, (2003), vol. 361, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(03)12193-9, pages 151 - 160, XP027155254

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(03)12193-9
    - HANIFIN JM; RAJKA G., "Diagnostic features of atopic dermatitis", ACTA DERM (STOCKH, (1980), vol. 92, pages 44 - 47
    - HELD E; SKOET R; JOHANSEN JD; AGNER T., "The Hand Eczema Severity Index (HECSI): a scoring system for clinical assessment of hand eczema. A study of inter- and intra-observer reliability", CONTACT DERMATITIS, (2005), vol. 152, pages 302 - 7
    - EMERSON RM; CHARMAN CR; WILLIAMS HC, "The Nottingham Eczema Severity Score: preliminary refinement of the Rajka and Langeland grading", BR J DERMATOL, (2000), vol. 142, pages 288 - 97
    - HON KL; MA KC; WONG E ET AL., "Validation of a self-administered questionnaire in Chinese in the assessment of eczema severity", PEDIATR DERMATOL, (2003), vol. 20, pages 465 - 9
    - WILLIAMS HC; BURNEY PG; PEMBROKE AC; HAY RJ, "The U.K. Working Party's Diagnostic Criteria for Atopic Dermatitis. III. Independent hospital validation", BR J DERMATOL, (1994), vol. 131, no. 3, pages 406 - 16
    - SANDILANDS A; TERRON-KWIATKOWSKI A; HULL PR; O'REGAN GM; CLAYTON TH ET AL., "Comprehensive analysis of the gene encoding filaggrin uncovers prevalent and rare mutations in ichthyosis vulgaris and atopic eczema", NAT GENET, (2007), vol. 39, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/ng2020, pages 650 - 654, XP055188818

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng2020