Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755977

EP2755977 - 6,8-DISUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/30]6, 8- DISUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC USE
[2016/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / ZAHAJSKA, Lenka
Pokraticka 1850/79
412 01 Litomerice / CZ
02 / HANUS, Jan
Prazskeho 604
152 00 Praha 5 / CZ
03 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
772 00 Olomouc / CZ
04 / VOLLER, Jiri
Pristavni ulice 10B
635 00 Brno-Bystrc / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
06 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 1678/18A
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2014/30]
Application number, filing date12775124.613.09.2012
[2016/44]
WO2012CZ00092
Priority number, dateUS201161535751P16.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161535751 P
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013037333
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755977
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2755977
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/34, A61K31/52, A61K31/522, A61P35/00, A61P3/00, A61P7/00, A61P19/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/49
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:6, 8-DISUBSTITUIERTE PURINZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE IHRE PHARMAZEUTISCHE UND KOSMETISCHE VERWENDUNG[2014/30]
English:6,8-DISUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC USE[2016/30]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE PURINES 6,8-DISUBSTITUÉES ET LEUR UTILISATION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET COSMÉTIQUE[2014/30]
Former [2014/30]6, 8- DISUBSTITUTED PURINE COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR PHARMACEUTICAL AND COSMETIC USE
Entry into regional phase25.03.2014National basic fee paid 
25.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
08.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2016Fee for grant paid
19.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2015
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
[2017/38]
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US3498970  (YAMADA YOSHITAKA, et al) [X] 1-3 * example 6 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2007125315  (ASTEX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-2,8-9 * example 2 * * claims 1, 35-68 *;
 [X]US2009312319  (REN PINGDA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8-9 * compounds 261, 263, 280 * * claims 1-20 *;
 [I]WO0149688  (UNIVERSITAIRE INSTELLING ANTWE [BE], et al) [I] 1-9 * claims 1-25 * * table 8 * * examples 6-10 *;
 [DYA]US5371089  (RATTAN SURESH I S [DK]) [DY] 1-13 * claims 1-20 * * abstract * [A] 14;
 [DYA]US2008009508  (SZUCOVA LUCIE [CZ], et al) [DY] 1-13 * claims 1-20 * * abstract * [A] 14;
 [DY]US5021422  (BOLUND LARS [DK], et al) [DY] 1-9 * abstract * * claims 1-3 *
 [X]  - MIKHAIL YU. STEKLOV ET AL, "Facile Synthesis of 8-Azido-6-Benzylaminopurine", NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20110701), vol. 30, no. 7-8, doi:10.1080/15257770.2011.602655, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 503 - 511, XP055048693 [X] 1-3 * page 504; compound 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15257770.2011.602655
 [X]  - TAYLOR J L ET AL, "Biotransformation of adenine and cytokinins by the rhizobacterium Serratia proteamaculans", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 67, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.PHYTOCHEM.2006.06.016, ISSN 0031-9422, (20060901), pages 1887 - 1894, (20060901), XP028059818 [X] 1-3 * page 1888; compounds 2,6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phytochem.2006.06.016
 [X]  - R DELIGT ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of disubstituted N6-cyclopentyladenine analoguesthe search for a neutral antagonist with high affinity for the adenosine A1 receptor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20040102), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0968-0896(03)00699-0, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 139 - 149, XP055048694 [X] 1,3,8-9 * page 140; compound 5 * * page 142; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(03)00699-0
 [X]  - HEONJOONG K ET AL, "Aplidiamine, a Unique Zwitterionic Benzyl Hydroxyadenine from the Western Australian Marine Ascidian Aplidiopsis sp", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970210), vol. 38, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00003-8, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 941 - 944, XP004033901 [X] 1-3 * page 941; compounds 1, 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00003-8
 [XY]  - CHONG-MAW CHEN ET AL, "Biosynthesis and cytokinin activity of 8-hydroxy and 2,8-dihydroxy derivatives of zeatin and N 6 -([Delta] 2 -isopentenyl)adenine", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19750701), vol. 14, no. 14, doi:10.1021/bi00685a008, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 3088 - 3093, XP055048703 [X] 1-3,5,8-9 * page 3089; compounds 1b, 2b * * abstract * * page 3092; figures 5-6 * * page 3092; table IV * [Y] 10-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00685a008
 [XY]  - LAURENCE G. DAMMANN ET AL, "Cytokinins: Synthesis of 2-, 8-, and 2,8-substituted 6-(3-methyl-2-butenylamino)purines and their relative activities in promoting cell growth", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (19740201), vol. 13, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0031-9422(00)91213-5, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 329 - 336, XP055048706 [X] 1-3,8-9 * page 331; compounds 1b,1h, 1n,1q * * page 332 - page 333; figures 1-3 * [Y] 10-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)91213-5
 [XY]  - R. MORNET ET AL, "Active Cytokinins: Photoaffinity Labeling Agents to Detect Binding", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (19791001), vol. 64, no. 4, doi:10.1104/pp.64.4.600, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 600 - 610, XP055048755 [X] 1-3,5,8-9 * compounds 1c,1d, 2c, 2d, 3c, 3d * * abstract * * page 606 - page 608 * [Y] 10-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.64.4.600
 [X]  - LETTRE, HANS ET AL, "Specific action of 6-purylhistamine on cancer cells", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1968:48119, URL: STN, XP002689788 [X] 1,3,8-9 * abstract * * RN: 15402-61-6 *
    [] - LETTRE, HANS ET AL, "Specific action of 6-purylhistamine on cancer cells", NATURWISSENSCHAFTEN , 55(1), 43 CODEN: NATWAY; ISSN: 0028-1042, (1968),
Examination   - Roland K. Robins, "Potential Purine Antagonists. XV. Preparation of Some 6,8-Disubstituted Purines 1", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19581201), vol. 80, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ja01557a051, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6671 - 6679, XP055195888

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01557a051
    - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. RN: 1282106-37-9,
by applicantUS5021422
 US5371089
 US5602139
 US5614407
 US2008009508
    - LETHAM, LIFE SCI, (1963), vol. 8, pages 569 - 573,
    - SHAW ET AL., PROC. CHEM. SOC., (1964), page 231,
    - EMERY ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 117, pages 1515 - 23,
    - HORGAN ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1975), vol. 14, pages 1005 - 8,
    - HORGAN ET AL., TETRAHEDERON LETT., (1973), vol. 30, pages 2827 - 2828,
    - TAKAHASHI ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 17, pages 1201 - 1207,
    - MOK ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 21, pages 1509 - 1511,
    - ROELEN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, page 1463,
    - SZEKERES ET AL., J. HETEROCYCLIC. CHEM., (1975), vol. 12, page 15,
    - AMES ET AL., MUTATION RESEARCH, (1975), vol. 31, pages 347 - 364,
    - MARON ET AL., MUTATION RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 113, pages 173 - 215,