Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751026

EP2751026 - A PROCESS FOR GENERATION OF HYDROGEN AND SYNGAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Council of Scientific & Industrial Research
Anusandhan Bhawan 2, Rafi Marg
New Delhi 110 001 / IN
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / RAYALU, Sadhana, Suresh
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
02 / CHAKRABARTI, Tapan
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
03 / JOSHI, Meenal, Vivek
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
04 / MANGRULKAR, Priti, Ashok
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
05 / LABHSETWAR, Nitin, Kumar
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
06 / YADAV, Renu, Mahendra, Singh
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
07 / PRABHU, Chandan
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
08 / WATE, Satish, Ramchandra
National Environmental Engineering Research
Institute
Nehru Marg
Nagpur Maharashtra 440020 / IN
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date12775313.503.09.2012
[2017/30]
WO2012IN00576
Priority number, dateIN2011DEL91730.09.2011         Original published format: IN 917DE2011
[2017/16]
Former [2014/28]IN2011DEL091730.09.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013046228
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751026
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2751026
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/06, // C12P3/00, B01J35/00
[2017/07]
Former International [2014/28]C01B31/18, C01B3/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON WASSERSTOFF UND SYNTHESEGAS[2014/28]
English:A PROCESS FOR GENERATION OF HYDROGEN AND SYNGAS[2014/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'HYDROGÈNE ET DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
20.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2017Fee for grant paid
13.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2016
Opposition(s)30.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.09.2012
AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE03.09.2017
LU03.09.2017
MT03.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE03.09.2017
LU03.09.2017
MT03.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE03.09.2017
LU03.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/34]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
IE03.09.2017
LU03.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/26]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2003027023  (DUTIL FREDERIC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0083]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4427508  (LICHTIN NORMAN N [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, line 45 - column 6, line 60 *;
 [Y]  - FAVRE N ET AL, "Biocatalytic capture of CO2 with carbonic anhydrase and its transformation to solid carbonate", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 60, no. 3-4, ISSN 1381-1177, (20091001), pages 163 - 170, (20090506), XP026439361 [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [02.3] *
 [Y]  - SONG ET AL, "Global challenges and strategies for control, conversion and utilization of CO2 for sustainable development involving energy, catalysis, adsorption and chemical processing", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 115, no. 1-4, ISSN 0920-5861, (20060630), pages 2 - 32, (20060630), XP027975904 [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [06.7] - paragraph [6.10] *
by applicantUS7132090
 US6524843
 US2008003662
 US2005214936
 US2006128004
 US6846584
    - S. BHATTACHARYA; A. NAYAK; M. SCHIAVONE; SK. BHATTACHARYA, "Solubilization and concentration of carbon dioxide: Novel spray reactors with immobilized carbonic anhydrase", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 86, pages 37 - 46
    - S. BHATTACHARYA; M. SCHIAVONE; S. CHAKRABARTI; S. K. BHATTACHARYA, "C02 hydration by immobilized carbonic anhydrase", BIOTECHNOLOGY APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 38, pages 111 - 117
    - LI-H. CHENG; L. ZHANG; HUAN-L. CHEN; CONG-J CONG-JIE GAO, "Hollow fiber contained hydrogel-CA membrane contactor for carbon dioxide removal from the enclosed spaces", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 324, pages 33 - 43
    - G.M. BOND; J. STRINGER; D.K. BRANDVOLD; SIMSEK F.A.; M. MEDINA; G. EGELAND, "Development of Integrated System for Biomimmetic CO2 Sequestration", ENZYME CARBONIC ANHYDRASE, ENERGY & FUELS, (2001), vol. 15, pages 309 - 316
    - D. DZIEDIC; K.B GROSS; R. A. GORSKI; J.T. JOHNSON, "Feasibility study of using brine for carbon dioxide capture and storage from fixed sources", JOURNAL OF AIR AND WASTE MANAGEMENT ASSOE, (2006), vol. 56, pages 1631 - 1641
    - A. BELZIL; C. PARENT, BIOCHEM. CELL BIOL., (2005), vol. 83, pages 70 - 77
    - E. OZDEMIR, "Biomimetic CO2 Sequestration: 1. Immobilization of Carbonic Anhydrase", POLYURETHANE FOAM, ENERGY FUELS, (2009), vol. 23, pages 5725 - 5730
    - S. K. CHAKRABARTI; S. BHATTACHARYA; BHATTACHARYA S.K., "immobilization of D-ribose-1,5-bisphosphate carboxylase 1 oxygenase: A step toward carbon dioxide fixation process.", BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 81, pages 705 - 711
    - N. FAVRE; M.L. CHRIST; C.P. PIERRE, "Biocatalytic capture of C02 with carbonic anhydrase and its transformation to solid carbonate", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS B: ENZYMATIC., (2009), vol. 60, pages 163 - 170
    - P. MIRJAFARI; K. ASGHARI; N. MAHINPEY, "Investigating the application of enzyme carbonic anhydrase for C02 sequestration purposes", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2007), vol. 46, pages 921 - 926
    - "Immobilization of carbonic anhydrase enriched microorganism on biopolymer based materials", C. PRABHU; S. WANJARI; S. GAWANDE; S. DAS; N. LABHSETWAR; S. KOTWAL; A.K.PURI; T.SATYANARAYANA, S. RAYALU, Journal of Molecular Catalalysis B: Enzymatic., (2009), vol. 60, pages 13 - 21