blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2751026 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2751026



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 526
30.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.06.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.06.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.06.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
07.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
24.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Description Search / examination 27
24.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.10.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
20.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.04.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
09.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
08.04.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.01.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
24.01.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
24.01.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
24.01.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.01.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.10.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.10.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.10.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.09.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
06.09.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.09.2013 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.09.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.09.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.09.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.08.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.08.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.08.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.08.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
22.08.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.08.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.08.2013 Notification of defects in correspondence PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2013 Drawings PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.07.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
30.07.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.07.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.07.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.07.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 87
04.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.04.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 58
14.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
14.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
14.12.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
07.12.2012 Notification relating to priority claim International Searching Authority 2
22.11.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
16.10.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.10.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
16.10.2012 Description International Searching Authority 53
16.10.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 2