blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2751026


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
01.06.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
23.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
16.06.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
16.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.06.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.03.2017 Change - priority published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
06.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2017 Change - classification published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Change - classification published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
13.01.2017 Change - classification published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
26.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.06.2016 First examination report
28.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
22.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
06.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.10.2012 PCT data prior to European publication