blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2763685 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2763685



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 486
24.02.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.03.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.02.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.02.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
19.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 74
22.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 74
09.07.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.07.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
08.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
08.07.2015 Description Search / examination 3
08.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.07.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.05.2015 Annex Search / examination 9
13.05.2015 Annex Search / examination 5
13.05.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
26.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.02.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 6
01.07.2014 Letter concerning biological material Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
07.05.2014 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
14.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.06.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
11.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.04.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 77
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.03.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.02.2013 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable International Searching Authority 6
12.10.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
12.10.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 4
12.10.2012 Description International Searching Authority 49
12.10.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 12