blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2758341 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2758341



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 207
14.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
14.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.09.2019 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.06.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.06.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.12.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
26.03.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
26.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
26.03.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
19.03.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
19.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
31.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
08.01.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
08.01.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.01.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.09.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.09.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
27.09.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
03.04.2013 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
28.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
28.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
14.03.2013 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.02.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
27.02.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.02.2013 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.02.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
14.02.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
14.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
14.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
22.11.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
06.11.2012 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
25.10.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
25.10.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
25.10.2012 Description International Searching Authority 18
25.10.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
25.10.2012 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
25.10.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 2