blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2758341


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.06.2019 First examination report
11.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
29.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
03.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
25.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
26.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
09.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication