blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2758341
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9742003Global Dossier 22.08.2017B2
US2014332717 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR00365 13.09.2012
FR1102846 20.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2758341Global Dossier 30.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR00365 13.09.2012
FR1102846 20.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013041780Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1102846 20.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2980191 24.10.2014B1
FR2980191 22.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1102846 20.09.2011