Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758341

EP2758341 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A SILICON/CARBON COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND USE OF SUCH A MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, Rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Université d'Orléans
Château de la Source
BP 6749
Avenue du Parc Floral
45067 Orléans / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
25, rue Leblanc
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Université d'Orleans
Château de la Source BP 6749 Avenue du Parc Floral
45067 Orleans / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PAIREAU, Cyril
62 rue de la Basse Lande
44115 Haute Goulaine / FR
02 / JOUANNEAU-SI LARBI, Séverine
1468 rue Ambroise Carrier
38590 Sillans / FR
03 / BEGUIN, François
230 rue de Lorette
45160 Olivet / FR
04 / RAYMUNDO-PINERO, Encarnacion
109 rue Guy de Maupassant
45100 Orléans / FR
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Talbot, Alexandre , et al
Cabinet Hecké
28 Cours Jean Jaurès
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Talbot, Alexandre , et al
Cabinet Hecké
Europole
10, rue d'Arménie - BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date12775727.613.09.2012
WO2012FR00365
Priority number, dateFR2011000284620.09.2011         Original published format: FR 1102846
[2014/31]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041780
Date:28.03.2013
Language:FR
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758341
Date:30.07.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/02, C04B35/628, H01M4/133, H01M4/134
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUM-/KOHLENSTOFFVERBUNDMATERIALS UND VERWENDUNG EINES DERARTIGEN MATERIALS[2014/31]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING A SILICON/CARBON COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND USE OF SUCH A MATERIAL[2014/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE SILICIUM/CARBONE ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL MATÉRIAU[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2014National basic fee paid 
19.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
27.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational searchCN1800094  [ ] (UNIV FUDAN [CN]);
 [A]WO2010029135  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1,11-13 * claims 1,2,11,13,14,16,17 *
 [XDI]  - XING FAN ET AL, "Electrospinning preparation of nanosilicon/disordered carbon composite as anode materials in Li-Ion battery", ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID-STATE LETTERS ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY INC. USA, (200910), vol. 12, no. 10, ISSN 1099-0062, pages A199 - A201, XP002673407 [XD] 11-13 * the whole document * [I] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.3186642
 [A]  - DOH C-H ET AL, "Synthesis of silicon-carbon by polyaniline coating and electrochemical properties of the Si-C / Li cell", BULLETIN OF THE KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 20060820 KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY KR, (20060820), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1175 - 1180, XP002673408 [A] 1,11-13 * page page 117, column l - page 1176, column r * * page 1180, tableau 1 et colonne de gauche *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5012/bkcs.2006.27.8.1175
 [A]  - ZHANG, TAO ET AL, "Silicon/carbon core-shell structured nano composite material for secondary lithium battery anode and its manufacture", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20061130), Database accession no. 145:474754, URL: STN, XP002673409 [A] 1,11-13 * abstract *
 [AD]  - GUO Z P ET AL, "Silicon/disordered carbon nanocomposites for lithium-ion battery anodes", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY 2005 ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY INC. US, (2005), vol. 152, no. 11, doi:DOI:10.1149/1.2051847, pages A2211 - A2216, XP002673410 [AD] 1,11-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1149/1.2051847
 [A]  - GUO Z P ET AL, "Optimizing synthesis of silicon/disordered carbon composites for use as anode materials in lithium-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 159, no. 1, ISSN 0378-7753, (20060913), pages 332 - 335, (20060913), XP027937951 [A] 1,11-13 * the whole document *
by applicant   - SENKEVICH ET AL., "Thermal Transformations of Polyvinyl Alcohol as a Source for the Preparation of Carbon Materials", SOLID FUEL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 51 - 58