Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2763946

EP2763946 - METHOD FOR PREPARING 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE, USES THEREOF, AND COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING SAID 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2018New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fonds de Developpement des Filières des Oleagineux et Proteagineux (FIDOP)
12 Avenue Georges V
75008 Paris / FR
For:FR 
Université Claude Bernard Lyon I
43 boulevard du 11 Novembre 1918
69622 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LEMAIRE, Marc
32 rue M. du peuble
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
02 / DAYOUB, Wissam
270 Cours Lafayette
69003 Lyon / FR
03 / SUTTER, Marc
18 rue Léon Fabre
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / RAOUL, Yann
34 rue de Launay
02650 Crezancy / FR
 [2015/09]
Former [2014/33]01 / LEMAIRE, Marc
32 rue M. du peuble
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
02 / DAYOUB, Wissam
128 boulevard du 11 novembre 1918
Apt 610
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
03 / SUTTER, Marc
18 rue Léon Fabre
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / RAOUL, Yann
34 rue de Launay
02650 Crezancy / FR
Representative(s)Lienard, Benoît , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2014/33]
Application number, filing date12775821.705.10.2012
WO2012FR52263
Priority number, dateFR2011005898005.10.2011         Original published format: FR 1158980
[2014/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013050717
Date:11.04.2013
Language:FR
[2013/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2763946
Date:13.08.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2013
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07C41/16, C07C43/10, A61K8/33, A61K47/08, C09D9/00, C10L10/00, C11D3/43, C11D7/50
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPAN, SEINE VERWENDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DIESEM 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPAN[2014/33]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE, USES THEREOF, AND COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING SAID 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE[2014/33]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DU 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE, UTILISATIONS ET COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT LEDIT 1,2,3-TRIMETHOXYPROPANE[2014/33]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2014National basic fee paid 
30.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/33]
01.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
04.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201706   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2018
31.10.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]BRPI0700063  (UNIV RIO DE JANEIRO [BR]) [X] 8,11 * page 3, line 8 - line 18 * * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 6 * * page 7 - page 8; example - * * claim - * * figure - * [Y] 1-7;
 [X]CH670832  (RICO S A LAUSANNE) [X] 12,13 * claim - * * page 3, column 1, line 57 - line 60 * * page 3, column 2, line 40 - line 60 * * page 4, column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 7; example 2 *;
 [X]CN100372897C  (UNIV TONGJI [CN]) [X] 8,11 * page 10; example 1 *;
 [X]  - JOSÉ I. GARCÍA ET AL, "Green solvents from glycerol. Synthesis and physico-chemical properties of alkyl glycerol ethers", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (20100101), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1039/b923631g, ISSN 1463-9262, page 426, XP055025451 [X] 9,10 * page 429; figures 4-5 * * page 431, column 2, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b923631g
 [Y]  - Andreas Merz, "phase transfer catalyzed alkylation of alcohols by diemthylsulfate in an aqueous system", Angewandte cHemie, (19730101), pages 846 - 847, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/anie.197308461/asset/197308461_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=h1gji60f&s=d3c0d62efbb1255bcbc2328e486a9ec7c31780c7, (20120425), XP055025668 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
 [T]  - JYH-SHYONG CHANG ET AL, "Methylation of Glycerol with Dimethyl Sulfate To Produce a New Oxygenate Additive for Diesels", INDUSTRIAL & ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (20120118), vol. 51, no. 2, doi:10.1021/ie201612t, ISSN 0888-5885, pages 655 - 661, XP055025461 [T] 1-7 * page 659, column 1; figure 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie201612t
by applicant   - THIBAULT ET AL., GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 13, page 357
    - SCALARONE ET AL., JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL AND APPLIED PYROLYSIS, (2001), vol. 58-59, pages 503 - 512
    - FAIRBOURNE ET AL., JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1931), pages 445 - 458