Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2702550

EP2702550 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CACHING IN A NETWORKED ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ikanos Communications, Inc.
47669 Fremont Boulevard Fremont
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / BLACK, Jonathan, J.
5 Wemrock Drive
Ocean NJ 07712 / US
02 / KALUSKAR, Pramod, B.
25 Winter Street
Edison NJ 08820 / US
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Keseris, Denis , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/10]
Application number, filing date12777025.325.04.2012
WO2012US35031
Priority number, dateUS201161478592P25.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161478592 P
[2014/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012149043
Date:01.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2702550
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012
[2014/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/10, G06F12/08, G06F17/30, H04L29/08
[2014/40]
Former International [2014/10]G06Q50/10, G06F12/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CACHESPEICHERUNG IN EINER NETZWERKUMGEBUNG[2014/10]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CACHING IN A NETWORKED ENVIRONMENT[2014/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN CACHE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT EN RÉSEAU[2014/10]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2013National basic fee paid 
22.10.2013Search fee paid 
22.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/10]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/21]
14.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011082924  (GOPALAKRISHNAN KUMAR [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0141] *;
 [XI]US6917960  (DECASPER DAN S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-15 * abstract * * column 2 - column 10; figures 1-3; claims 1-4, 14-20, 25-26, 31-32, 35-37, 39-40, 42-43, 47 * [I] 2;
 [X]WO2005048011  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]; LI JUN [US]; ZHANG JUNBIAO [US]; VERMA SNIG) [X] 1-3,13-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 43 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 40 * * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 8; claims 1, 4, 5, 9, 11, 13-17 *
International search[X]US7814483  (LI JUN [US], et al);
 [Y]US7299271  (SATO SHINOBU [JP]);
 [Y]US6917960  (DECASPER DAN S [US], et al);
 [A]KR20050119400  (PANTECH CO LTD [KR])
by applicantUS2011082924
 US6917960
 WO2005048011