Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757899

EP2757899 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE FRACTIONS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hochschule Ostwestfalen-Lippe
Liebigstrasse 87
32657 Lemgo / DE
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / DANNEEL, Hans-Jürgen
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 145 c
32760 Detmold / DE
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Holland, Ralf , et al
Eikel & Partner GbR
Anwaltskanzlei
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 107
32760 Detmold / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Holland, Ralf , et al
Eikel & Partner GbR, Hünenweg 15
32760 Detmold / DE
Application number, filing date12777851.221.09.2012
WO2012DE00931
Priority number, dateDE20111011419822.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114198
[2014/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013041080
Date:28.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757899
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23J3/34, C07K1/12, C07K1/16
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PEPTIDFRAKTIONEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2014/31]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE FRACTIONS AND USE THEREOF[2014/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FRACTIONS PEPTIDIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase14.03.2014National basic fee paid 
14.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
14.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
15.01.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/12]
14.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]  - HODGES R S ET AL, "Multi-column preparative reversed-phase sample displacement chromatography of peptides", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, vol. 548, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(01)88608-8, ISSN 0021-9673, (19910712), pages 267 - 280, (19910712), XP026514504 [X] 1-4,11,14-17 * Zusammenfassung; Einführung; Material;Tabelle II; Fig.6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)88608-8
 [X]  - REN ET AL, "Purification and identification of antioxidant peptides from grass carp muscle hydrolysates by consecutive chromatography and electrospray ionization-mass spectrometry", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, (20071117), vol. 108, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FOODCHEM.2007.11.010, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 727 - 736, XP022420603 [X] 1-6,9,11,14-17 * Zusammenfassung; page 729 - page 731; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2007.11.010
 [X]  - ZIAD. ISKANDARANI ET AL, "Liquid chromatographic separation of amino acids, peptides, and derivatives on a porous polystyrene-divinylbenzene copolymer", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19810301), vol. 53, no. 3, doi:10.1021/ac00226a025, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 489 - 495, XP055053197 [X] 1-6,13 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00226a025
 [X]  - KORHONEN H ET AL, "Bioactive peptides: Production and functionality", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, vol. 16, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.IDAIRYJ.2005.10.012, ISSN 0958-6946, (20060901), pages 945 - 960, (20060901), XP024963296 [X] 18,19 * page 948 - page 949; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.idairyj.2005.10.012
 [A]  - KAREL STULÍK ET AL, "Stationary phases for peptide analysis by high performance liquid chromatography: a review", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (19971001), vol. 352, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0003-2670(97)00262-6, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 1 - 19, XP055053260 [A] 12 * page 9 - page 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-2670(97)00262-6
 [A]  - HUANG ET AL, "Applications of Preparative High-Performance Liquid Chromatography to the Separation and Purification of Peptides and Proteins", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19890101), vol. 492, doi:10.1016/S0378-4347(00)84477-1, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 431 - 469, XP002406442 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)84477-1
 [XPA]  - PÁDRAIGÍN A. HARNEDY ET AL, "Bioactive peptides from marine processing waste and shellfish: A review", JOURNAL OF FUNCTIONAL FOODS, (20120101), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jff.2011.09.001, ISSN 1756-4646, pages 6 - 24, XP055053205 [XP] 18,19 * page 17 - page 18; table 4 * [A] 1-17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jff.2011.09.001
 [AP]  - NAVAM S HETTIARACHCHY ET AL, Food Proteins Peptides Determination and Characterization, FOOD PROTEINS AND PEPTIDES : CHEMISTRY, FUNCTIONALITY INTERACTIONS, AND COMMERCIALIZATION, CRC PRESS, BOCA RATON, FLA., USA, PAGE(S) 25 - 48, (20120131), ISBN 978-1-4200-9341-4, XP008160132 [AP] 1-17 * Seiten 33-337, 40-42;; figure 2.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1201/b11768-3