Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754156

EP2754156 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING ENERGY BY NUCLEAR REACTIONS OF HYDROGEN ADSORBED BY ORBITAL CAPTURE ON A NANOCRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE OF A METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Piantelli, Silvia
Strada Petriccio-Belriguardo 120
53100 Siena (SI) / IT
For all designated states
Meiarini, Alessandro
Strada Petriccio Belriguardo 128
53100 Siena / IT
For all designated states
Ciampoli, Leonardo
Via Malibran 17
20090 Trezzano Sul Naviglio / IT
For all designated states
Chellini, Fabio
Via Piemonte 3
53100 Colle Val D'Elsa / IT
[2014/29]
Inventor(s)01 / PIANTELLI, Francesco
Strada Petriccio Belriguardo 120
I-53100 Siena / IT
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Celestino, Marco
ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31
56123 Pisa / IT
[2014/29]
Application number, filing date12778404.913.07.2012
[2016/20]
WO2012IB53615
Priority number, dateIT2011PI0007914.07.2011         Original published format: IT PI20110079
[2014/29]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013008219
Date:17.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/03]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2754156
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2013
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2754156
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G21B3/00
[2014/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIEERZEUGUNG DURCH NUKLEARREAKTIONEN VON DURCH ORBITALE ERFASSUNG AUF EINER NANOKRISTALLINEN STRUKTUR EINES METALLS ADSORBIERTEM WASSERSTOFF[2014/29]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING ENERGY BY NUCLEAR REACTIONS OF HYDROGEN ADSORBED BY ORBITAL CAPTURE ON A NANOCRYSTALLINE STRUCTURE OF A METAL[2014/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRODUIRE DE L'ÉNERGIE PAR DES RÉACTIONS NUCLÉAIRES D'HYDROGÈNE ADSORBÉ PAR UNE CAPTURE ORBITALE SUR UNE STRUCTURE NANOCRISTALLINE D'UN MÉTAL[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/29]
25.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/29]
24.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
11.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2016Fee for grant paid
04.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
24.04.2014Request for further processing filed
24.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
24.04.2014Request for further processing filed
24.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
GR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
24.04.2014Request for further processing filed
24.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
24.04.2014Request for further processing filed
24.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
24.04.2014Request for further processing filed
24.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201403   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.07.2012
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU13.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/33]HU13.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/31]HU13.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.07.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
LU13.07.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/23]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
CH31.07.2016
LI31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/17]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/03]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
BE31.07.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2010058288  (PIANTELLI SILVIA, et al) [AD] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009125444  (PASCUCCI MADDALENA [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,6,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO9520816  (FOCARDI SERGIO [IT], et al) [AD] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007130156  (PROFUSION ENERGY INC [US], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] *
 [A]  - BAKSHT ET AL., "Determination of the negative hydrogen ion concentration in a cesium-hydrogen discharge", TECHNICAL PHYSICS, (200108), vol. 46, no. 8, ISSN 0044-4642, pages 946 - 951, XP002669483 [A] 1,3-6,8,9 * page 946, paragraph 1 - page 947, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/1.1395113
 [A]  - VOLKOV ET AL., "Generation of high-energy negative hydrogen ions upon the interaction of superintense femtosecond laser radiation with a solid target", JETP LETTERS, Russia, (2002), vol. 76, no. 3, doi:10.1134/1.1514755, ISSN 0370-274X, pages 139 - 142, XP002669484 [A] 1,5,6,8,9 * page 139, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/1.1514755
by applicantWO2010058288
 WO9520816