Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800765

EP2800765 - PROCESS FOR POLYMERIZING OR COPOLYMERIZING ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS IN THE PRESENCE OF FREE-RADICAL POLYMERIZATION INITIATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / BERHALTER, Klaus
Brenigerstraße 2
53332 Bornheim-Dersdorf / DE
02 / GONIOUKH, Andrei
Am Kapellenbusch 15
50374 Erftstadt / DE
03 / HERRMANN, Thomas
Thessaloniki-Allee 9
51103 Köln / DE
04 / FINOTTO, David
25 avenue Jean Giono
F-13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR
05 / RIEU, Gilles
18 Allée des pins
F-13250 Saint-Chamas / FR
06 / HAUTIER, Laurent
230 Chemin de la Valentine
F-13450 Puyricard / FR
07 / TREIS, Christoph
Katharinenstraße 16
53844 Troisdorf / DE
 [2016/17]
Former [2015/11]01 / BERHALTER, Klaus
Brenigerstraße 2
53332 Bornheim-Dersdorf / DE
02 / GONIOUKH, Andrei
Am Kapellenbusch 15
50374 Erftstadt / DE
03 / HERRMANN, Thomas
Thessaloniki-Allee 9
51103 Köln / DE
04 / FINOTTO, David
25 avenue Jean Giono
F-13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR
05 / RIEU, Gilles
18 Allée des pins
F-13250 Saint-Chamas / FR
06 / HAUTIER, Laurent
Apt 610, 15 Burton Place
M15 4LR Manchester / GB
07 / TREIS, Christoph
Katharinenstraße 16
53844 Troisdorf / DE
Former [2015/01]01 / BERHALTER, Klaus
Brenigerstraße 2
53332 Bornheim-Dersdorf / DE
02 / GONIOUKH, Andrei
Am Kapellenbusch 15
50374 Erftstadt / DE
03 / HERRMANN, Thomas
Thessaloniki-Allee 9
51103 Köln / DE
04 / FINOTTO, David
25 avenue Jean Giono
F-13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR
05 / RIEU, Gilles
18 Allée des pins
F-13250 Saint-Chamas / FR
06 / HAUTIER, Laurent
230 Chemin de la Valentine
F-13540 Puyricard / FR
07 / TREIS, Christoph
Katharinenstraße 16
53844 Troisdorf / DE
Former [2014/46]01 / BERHALTER, Klaus
Brenigerstraße 2
53332 Bornheim-Dersdorf / DE
02 / GONIOUKH, Andrei
Am Kapellenbusch 15
50374 Erftstadt / DE
03 / HERRMANN, Thomas
Hicklerstraße 5
64287 Darmstadt / DE
04 / FINOTTO, David
25 avenue Jean Giono
F-13090 Aix-en-Provence / FR
05 / RIEU, Gilles
18 Allée des pins
F-13250 Saint-Chamas / FR
06 / HAUTIER, Laurent
230 Chemin de la Valentine
F-13540 Puyricard / FR
07 / TREIS, Christoph
Katharinenstraße 16
53844 Troisdorf / DE
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Höchst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. C657, 2nd floor
Industriepark Höchst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date12779076.401.11.2012
[2016/20]
WO2012EP71644
Priority number, dateEP2011018769003.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11187690
US201161556639P07.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161556639 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013064586
Date:10.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800765
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800765
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG ODER COPOLYMERISIERUNG ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTER MONOMERE BEI VORHANDENSEIN VON RADIKALPOLYMERISATIONSINITIATOREN[2016/08]
English:PROCESS FOR POLYMERIZING OR COPOLYMERIZING ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS IN THE PRESENCE OF FREE-RADICAL POLYMERIZATION INITIATORS[2014/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION OU COPOLYMÉRISATION DE MONOMÈRES INSATURÉS DU POINT DE VUE DE L'ÉTHYLÈNE EN PRÉSENCE D'INITIATEURS DE POLYMÉRISATION À RADICAUX LIBRES[2016/08]
Former [2014/46]VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISIERUNG ODER COPOLYMERISIERUNG ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTER MONOMERE IN GEGENWART VON RADIKALPOLYMERISATIONSINITIATOREN
Former [2014/46]PROCÉDÉ POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION OU COPOLYMÉRISATION DE MONOMÈRES À INSATURATION ÉTHYLÉNIQUE EN PRÉSENCE D'INITIATEURS DE POLYMÉRISATION RADICALAIRE
Entry into regional phase05.05.2014National basic fee paid 
05.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2016Fee for grant paid
29.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2016
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.11.2012
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
MT01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU01.11.2012
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
MT01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU01.11.2012
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
MT01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU01.11.2012
AT18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU01.11.2012
AT18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
GB01.11.2016
IE01.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]WO0160875  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 4, lines 16-29 *;
 [Y]US5756606  (WONG TANG HONG [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4803251  (GOODE MARK G [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1,8,12 *
by applicantEP0811590
 EP1013678
 WO0160875