Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2761202

EP2761202 - IMPROVED FRICTION MATERIAL TOOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019Change - applicantpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenneco Inc.
500 North Field Drive
Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US
[2019/14]
Former [2018/33]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Corporation
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield MI 48034 / US
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Corporation
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KULIS, Stanley, Frank
1545 Hillsdale Drive
Cookeville, TN 38506 / US
02 / BUXTON, Carl, Richard
2038 Kayla Court
Cookeville, TN 38506 / US
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Barker, Rosemary Anne
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date12779211.727.09.2012
WO2012US57478
Priority number, dateUS201161540858P29.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161540858 P
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013049298
Date:04.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2761202
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2013
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16D69/04
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES REIBMATERIALWERKZEUG[2014/32]
English:IMPROVED FRICTION MATERIAL TOOLING[2014/32]
French:OUTILLAGE À MATÉRIAU DE FROTTEMENT AMÉLIORÉ[2014/32]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/32]
22.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XYI]FR2192664  (ABEX PAGID EQUIP [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,11-20 * page 1, line 32 - page 3, line 34; figures 1-4 * [Y] 22 [I] 5,7,9,21;
 [XY]US2005048160  (SAKAMOTO YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10-12,18 * paragraphs [0003] - [0015]; figures 7-11 * [Y] 22;
 [X]US3190397  (CAMILLE SUDRES PIERRE) [X] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1440107  (FABRICATIONS ASSOCIEES DENISON) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2005082124
 US5413194