EP2776500 - POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR BUMPERS AND INTERIORS AND POLYETHYLENE-BASED RESIN PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANTINEL, Fabiana Vicolo Circolo 18 I-37122 Verona / IT | 02 /
WILLEMS, Sander Strada San Bruno 16 43123 Parma / IT | 03 /
GRAZZI, Michele Via Ranuzzi 225B I-44040 Casaglia (FE) / IT | 04 /
PELLEGATTI, Giampaolo Via Virgili 30 I-44030 Boara (FE) / IT | 05 /
ROHRMANN, Jürgen Neue Heimat 2 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 06 /
MIHAN, Shahram Schillerstrasse 25 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/38] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 12780188.4 | 30.10.2012 | [2016/03] | WO2012EP71443 | Priority number, date | EP20110188846 | 11.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11188846 | US201161559479P | 14.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161559479 P | [2014/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013068273 | Date: | 16.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2776500 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2776500 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L23/10, C08L23/12, C08K3/34 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08F210/16 (US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (CN);
C08L2205/03 (CN);
C08L2205/035 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925, C08F4/7042 (EP,US);
C08L23/06, C08L23/06, C08L2205/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C08L2205/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L23/06, C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08L23/0815, C08L23/16 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L23/06, C08L23/16, C08L2205/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08L23/0815, C08K3/34 (CN);
C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08L23/0815, C08L23/14, C08K3/34 (CN);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17 (US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/27, C08F2500/35 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR STOSSSTANGEN UND INNENRÄUME UND POLYETHYLENBASIERTE HARZVORLÄUFER | [2015/33] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR BUMPERS AND INTERIORS AND POLYETHYLENE-BASED RESIN PRECURSOR | [2014/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE POUR PARE-CHOCS ET INTÉRIEURS ET PRÉCURSEUR DE RÉSINE À BASE DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/38] | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR STOSSSTANGEN UND INNENRÄUME UND HARZVORLÄUFER AUF POLYETHYLENBASIS | ||
Former [2014/38] | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE POUR PARE-CHOCS ET INTÉRIEURS DE VOITURES ET PRÉCURSEUR RÉSINIQUE À BASE DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 18.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2012 | AL | 20.01.2016 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.10.2012 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1238796 (FOLIEPACK KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2004092631 (JOSEPH SEBASTIAN [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 15,16 *; | [A]WO2006024579 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008077530 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [YD]WO2010081676 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-4 * abstract * * page 5 *; | [A]US2010256281 (PALAMA MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2010115878 (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4245062 | US4473687 | EP0129368 | US4521566 | US4734459 | US5008204 | EP0472946 | EP0485823 | US5145819 | WO9303093 | US5324800 | EP0782587 | WO9827124 | WO0177191 | EP1236769 | WO03011962 | WO2004087807 | WO2006067023 | WO2010034520 | US2010160580 | WO2010081753 | WO2010081676 | WO2010112337 | - WILD, L., "Temperature rising elution fractionation", ADV. POLYMER SCI., (1990), vol. 98, pages 1 - 47 | - W. HOLTRUP, MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 178, page 2335 | - WILD ET AL., J. POLY. SCI., POLY. PHYS., (1982), vol. 20, page 441 | - C. J. CARMAN; R. A. HARRINGTON; C. E. WILKES, MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, pages 536 - 544 | - E.T .HSIEH; J.C. RANDALL, MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, pages 353 - 360 | - E.T .HSIEH; J.C. RANDALL, MACROMOLECULES, vol. 15, pages 1402 - 1406 | - J.C. RANDAL, MACROMOL. CHEM PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, page 201 | - M. KAKUGO; Y. NAITO; K. MIZUNUMA; T. MIYATAKE, MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, pages 1150 - 1152 | - Handbook of PE, MARCEL DEKKER INC., (2000), pages 7 - 10 | - BENOIT H.; REMPP P.; GRUBISIC Z, J. POLYMER SCI., PHYS. ED., (1967), vol. 5, page 753 | WO2011EP02613 |