Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777165

EP2777165 - WIRELESS ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH ANTENNA SWITCHING CIRCUITRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop. M/S 36-2PAT
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DIMPFLMAIER, Ronald, W.
10500 N. De Anza Blvd
M/S 35-2MP
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / LUM, Nicholas, W.
1 Infinite Loop
M/S 35-2MP
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Froud, Christopher Andrew , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London, SE1 2AU / GB
[2018/15]
Former [2014/38]Rooney, John-Paul
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date12780338.528.09.2012
[2018/15]
WO2012US58132
Priority number, dateUS201161569641P12.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161569641 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089891
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777165
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777165
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM ANTENNENUMSCHALTUNGSKREISLAUF[2014/38]
English:WIRELESS ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH ANTENNA SWITCHING CIRCUITRY[2014/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE RADIO À CIRCUITS DE COMMUTATION D'ANTENNES[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase10.06.2014National basic fee paid 
10.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
14.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2018Fee for grant paid
27.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2016
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE28.09.2018
LU28.09.2018
MT28.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/40]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE28.09.2018
LU28.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
Former [2019/38]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE28.09.2018
LU28.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
FR30.09.2018
Former [2019/33]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
IE28.09.2018
LU28.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
LU28.09.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1976131  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 37] * * claim 2 * * figures 2,4 * [Y] 2-5;
 [XY]US2010120466  (LI KEVIN [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0045] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-5 * * claims 8,9 * [Y] 2-7,9-12;
 [XY]US2009262042  (LI ER-WEI [CN], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0027] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 6,9-12;
 [X]EP1681772  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 8 * figures 2,3 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [XY]US2006025171  (LY LIEM [US], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * * figures 2,5 * * table 1 * [Y] 7;
 [E]WO2012145206  (APPLE INC [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * page 1, line 9 - line 20 * * page 9, line 4 - line 15 * * page 15, line 3 - line 23 * * page 18, line 13 - line 25 * * figures 1,3,5 * * claim 1 *;
 [XP]WO2012009172  (APPLE INC [US], et al) [XP] 1 * page 8, line 20 - line 32 * * page 9, line 31 - page 11, line 2 * * page 12, line 22 - line 31 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2011014879  (ALBERTH BILL [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [XYI]US2011116490  (WILHELMSSON LEIF [SE], et al) [X] 17,20,21 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 61] * * figures 11,13, 14, 15,16, 17, 18 * [Y] 19 [I] 18;
 [Y]WO2011084715  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 1-6 * * figures 11,12 *;
 [XA]US2006292986  (BITRAN YIGAL [IL], et al) [X] 17 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 4, 5,9,10,11 * [A] 18-21;
 [XP]WO2012061765  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [XP] 17 * paragraph [0054] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 60] * * figures 3,5-8 * * paragraph [0128] *;
 [A]US2008192806  (WYPER GEORGE ANDREW [FR], et al) [A] 17-21 * figures 3-5 * * claim 1 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Networks; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Study on signalling and procedure for interference avoidance for in-device coexistence; (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 36.816, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20101217), no. v1.0.0, pages 1 - 34, XP050462125 [A] 6,10-12,17-21 * the whole document *