Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786035

EP2786035 - BRAKE LINING FOR A DRUM BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Corporation
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Weiming
46995 Manhattan Circle
Novi, MI 48374 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2017/47]
Former [2014/41]Barker, Rosemary Anne
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date12780350.010.10.2012
[2017/47]
WO2012US59414
Priority number, dateUS20111330756330.11.2011         Original published format: US201113307563
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081728
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786035
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786035
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16D51/20, F16D65/08
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BREMSBELAG FÜR EINE TROMMELBREMSANORDNUNG[2014/41]
English:BRAKE LINING FOR A DRUM BRAKE ASSEMBLY[2014/41]
French:GARNITURE DE FREIN POUR UN ENSEMBLE FREIN À TAMBOUR[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2014National basic fee paid 
23.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2017Fee for grant paid
15.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.09.2016
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
[2019/28]
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE1400358  (BENDIX CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [I] 3,5-20;
 [XI]US3095950  (SCHEEL WALTHER F) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [I] 3,5-20;
 [XI]USRE31531E  (WILLIAM J WILLIAMS) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [I] 3,5-20;
 [XI]US4476968  (URBAN JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [I] 3,5-7,13-15;
 [XI]US3003591  (RIKE RICHARD C) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [I] 3,5-7,13-15;
 [XI]DE1258675  (PERROT BREMSE GMBH DEUTSCHE) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [I] 3,5-7,13-15;
 [XI]DE1280694  (BENDIX CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [I] 3,5-7,13-15;
 [I]GB2087995  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *