Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755994

EP2755994 - ESCHERICHIA COLI VACCINE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.10.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA
Rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
[2017/27]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SERINO, Laura
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Inc.
Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
02 / PIZZA, Mariagrazia
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Inc.
Via Fiorentina 1
I-53100 Siena / IT
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Sanderson, Andrew John , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents, CN9.25.1
980 Great West Road
Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Bullett, Rachel Margaret
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date12780542.214.09.2012
WO2012IB54825
Priority number, dateGB2011001590614.09.2011         Original published format: GB 201115906
GB2012001325125.07.2012         Original published format: GB 201213251
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013038385
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2755994
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/245, A61K39/108, A61P31/04
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
TitleGerman:ESCHERICHIA COLI KOMBINATIONS-IMPFSTOFF[2018/45]
English:ESCHERICHIA COLI VACCINE COMBINATION[2014/30]
French:VACCINS COMBINÉS CONTRE ESCHERICHIA COLI[2014/30]
Former [2014/30]IMPFSTOFFKOMBINATION GEGEN ESCHERICHIA COLI
Entry into regional phase14.04.2014National basic fee paid 
14.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
29.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2018
01.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
25.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2011080595  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1,9-19,21,22 * table 2; sequences 42,50 * [Y] 2-8;
 [YD]WO2011004263  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [YD] 1-19,22 * pages 100, 101; sequences 89-91,642 *;
 [IY]WO2009104092  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 21 * sequence 141 * [Y] 1-19,22;
 [YD]WO2006091517  (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [YD] 2 * claims 1, 5, 11, 12; sequence 138 *;
 [IY]WO2011007257  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 20,21 * example 3; claims 1-5 * [Y] 7,8
 [AD]  - MORIEL DANILO GOMES ET AL, "Identification of protective and broadly conserved vaccine antigens from the genome of extraintestinal pathogenic Escherichia coli", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 107, no. 20, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0915077107, ISSN 0027-8424, (20100518), pages 9072 - 9077, (20100503), XP002612615 [AD] 1-19,22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0915077107
by applicantWO2006089264
 WO2011004263
 WO2006091517
 WO9517211
 WO9842375
 WO9927961
 WO02074244
 WO02064162
 WO03028760
 WO9014837
 US5057540
 WO03024480
 WO03024481
 WO9840100
 US6207646
 US6239116
 US6429199
 WO9940936
 WO9944636
 WO9927960
 US6090406
 US5916588
 EP0626169
 WO9952549
 WO9911241
 WO9400153
 WO9857659
 EP0835318
 EP0735898
 EP0761231
 WO02081653
    - PNAS, (2010), vol. 107, no. 20, pages 9072 - 9077
    - BEIGNON ET AL., "The LTR72 Mutant of Heat-Labile Enterotoxin of Escherichia coli Enahnces the Ability of Peptide Antigens to Elicit CD4 T Cells and Secrete Gamma Interferon after Coapplication onto Bare Skin", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 3012 - 3019
    - PIZZA ET AL., "Mucosal vaccines: non toxic derivatives of LT and CT as mucosal adjuvants", VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00553-3, pages 2534 - 2541, XP004231077

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00553-3
    - PIZZA ET AL., "LTK63 and LTR72, two mucosal adjuvants ready for clinical trials", INT. J. MED. MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 290, no. 4-5, pages 455 - 461, XP002967367
    - SCHARTON-KERSTEN ET AL., "Transcutaneous Immunization with Bacterial ADP-Ribosylating Exotoxins, Subunits and Unrelated Adjuvants", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 68, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1128/IAI.68.9.5306-5313.2000, pages 5306 - 5313, XP002230158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.68.9.5306-5313.2000
    - RYAN ET AL., "Mutants of Escherichia coli Heat-Labile Toxin Act as Effective Mucosal Adjuvants for Nasal Delivery of an Acellular Pertussis Vaccine: Differential Effects of the Nontoxic AB Complex and Enzyme Activity on Thl and Th2 Cells", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 67, no. 12, pages 6270 - 6280, XP002162796
    - PARTIDOS ET AL., "Heat-labile enterotoxin of Escherichia coli and its site-directed mutant LTK63 enhance the proliferative and cytotoxic T-cell responses to intranasally co-immunized synthetic peptides", IMMUNOL. LETT., (1999), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 209 - 216, XP027347354
    - PEPPOLONI ET AL., "Mutants of the Escherichia coli heat-labile enterotoxin as safe and strong adjuvants for intranasal delivery of vaccines", VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 285 - 293
    - PINE ET AL., "Intranasal immunization with influenza vaccine and a detoxified mutant of heat labile enterotoxin from Escherichia coli (LTK63", J. CONTROL RELEASE, (2002), vol. 85, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00274-2, pages 263 - 270, XP004397784

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00274-2
    - DOMENIGHINI ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL, (1995), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 1165 - 1167
    - PATON ET AL., J EXP MED, (2004), vol. 200, pages 35 - 46
    - TAMURA K; DUDLEY J; NEI M; KUMAR S, "MEGA4: Molecular Evolutionary Genetics Analysis (MEGA) software version 4.0.", MOL BIOL EVOL, (2007), vol. 24, pages 1596 - 1599
    - TAMURA K; NEI M; KUMAR S, "Prospects for inferring very large phylogenies by using the neighbor-joining method", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 11030 - 11035
    - FIELDS ET AL., METH ENZYMOL, (1997), page 289
    - IBBA, BIOTECHNOL GENET ENG REV, (1996), vol. 13, pages 197 - 216
    - Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols, vol. 42
    - PODDA; DEL GIUDICE, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 197 - 203
    - PODDA, VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680
    - NIIKURA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2002), vol. 293, pages 273 - 280
    - LENZ ET AL., JLMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 166, pages 5346 - 5355
    - PINTO ET AL., JLNFECT DIS, (2003), vol. 188, pages 327 - 338
    - GERBER ET AL., J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, pages 4752 - 4760
    - GLUCK ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages B10 - B16
    - MERALDI ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 2485 - 2491
    - PAJAK ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 836 - 842
    - KRIEG, NATURE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 9, pages 831 - 835
    - MCCLUSKIE ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 32, pages 179 - 185
    - SCHELLACK ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, pages 5461 - 72
    - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278
    - EVANS ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 219 - 229
    - BEIGNON ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2002), vol. 70, pages 3012 - 3019
    - PIZZA ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2534 - 2541
    - PIZZA ET AL., INT JMED MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 290, pages 455 - 46 1
    - SCHARTON-KERSTEN ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2000), vol. 68, pages 5306 - 5313
    - RYAN ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1999), vol. 67, pages 6270 - 6280
    - PARTIDOS ET AL., IMMUNOL LETT, (1999), vol. 67, pages 209 - 216
    - PEPPOLONI ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 285 - 293
    - PINE ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2002), vol. 85, pages 263 - 270
    - SINGH ET AL., J CONT RELEASE, (2001), vol. 70, pages 267 - 276
    - ANDRIANOV ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 109 - 115
    - PAYNE ET AL., ADV DRUG DELIVERY REVIEW, (1998), vol. 31, pages 185 - 196
    - STANLEY, CLIN EXP DERMATOL, (2002), vol. 27, pages 571 - 577
    - JONES, CURR OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS, (2003), vol. 4, pages 214 - 218
    - DURANT ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2007), vol. 75, pages 1916 - 25