blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2755994 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2755994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 923
08.04.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 87
25.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 87
25.10.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 73
05.10.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 3
27.09.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
27.09.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 71
26.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Description Search / examination 70
26.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
19.09.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 4
31.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.08.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
31.08.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
06.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2018 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 2
12.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.06.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.06.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
17.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
17.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.05.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
13.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
06.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.04.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
01.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
20.06.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 68
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 70
04.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
04.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 7
21.03.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 73
21.03.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 79
26.10.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
26.10.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 2
26.10.2012 Description International Searching Authority 61
26.10.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 15