blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2755994


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.04.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.10.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.10.2018 Change - German title published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
28.09.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.02.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.08.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.06.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.06.2017 Change - applicant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
12.04.2017 Change - representative
22.02.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.06.2016 First examination report
16.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
01.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
03.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2014 Amendment by applicant
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication