blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2755994 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280055664 EP12780542



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10105429Global Dossier 23.10.2018B2
US2017296643 19.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
US201615369405 05.12.2016
GB201115906 14.09.2011
WO2012IB54825 14.09.2012
US201414344892 10.11.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9511130Global Dossier 06.12.2016B2
US2015118261 30.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
GB201115906 14.09.2011
WO2012IB54825 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014531442Global Dossier 27.11.2014A
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
GB201115906 14.09.2011
WO2012IB54825 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103930436Global Dossier 16.07.2014A
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
GB201115906 14.09.2011
WO2012IB54825 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2755994Global Dossier 23.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
GB201115906 14.09.2011
WO2012IB54825 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201115906D 26.10.2011D0
Priority number Date
GB201115906 14.09.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB201213251D 05.09.2012D0
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013038385Global Dossier 20.06.2013A3
WO2013038385 21.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
GB201213251 25.07.2012
GB201115906 14.09.2011