Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2768948

EP2768948 - PRODUCTION OF A HUMAN BETA CELL LINE FROM AN EARLY POST NATAL PANCREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERCELL BIOSOLUTIONS
1 place Pierre POTIER
31100 Toulouse / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
[2017/23]
Former [2016/21]For all designated states
UNIVERCELL BIOSOLUTIONS
1 place Pierre POTIER
31100 Toulouse / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3 rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Sarl Endocells
216 Boulevard Saint Germain
75007 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CZERNICHOW, Paul
27 rue de Fleurus
F-75006 Paris / FR
02 / RAVASSARD, Philippe
7 rue des Wallons
F-75013 Paris / FR
03 / SCHARFMANN, Raphael
3 rue de Larrey
F-75005 Paris / FR
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/23]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Former [2014/35]Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date12781298.018.10.2012
[2017/23]
WO2012EP70612
Priority number, dateUS201161548526P18.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161548526 P
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013057164
Date:25.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2768948
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013
[2014/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2768948
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/09, G01N33/50, G01N33/569, A01K67/027, C12N5/071
[2017/08]
Former International [2014/35]C12N5/10, A01K67/027, C12N5/071
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG EINER MENSCHLICHEN BETA ZELLLINIE AUS EINER BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSE FRÜH NACH DER GEBURT[2014/35]
English:PRODUCTION OF A HUMAN BETA CELL LINE FROM AN EARLY POST NATAL PANCREAS[2014/35]
French:PRODUCTION D'UNE LIGNÉE CELLULAIRE BÊTA HUMAINE TIRÉE D'UN PANCRÉAS AU DÉBUT DE LA PÉRIODE POST-NATALE[2014/35]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
19.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2017Fee for grant paid
24.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2015
Opposition(s)08.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.10.2012
AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU18.10.2017
MT18.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
LU18.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
MC07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/25]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SI07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
PL07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
SM07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
IS07.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT07.06.2017
CZ07.06.2017
EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RO07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
SK07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE07.06.2017
FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
LV07.06.2017
RS07.06.2017
BG07.09.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI07.06.2017
HR07.06.2017
LT07.06.2017
NO07.09.2017
GR08.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2008102000  (SARL ENDOCELLS [FR], et al) [XD] 15-38 * examples 1-4 * [I] 1-38;
 [A]US2005123521  (ZERN MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *;
 [XDI]  - RAVASSARD PHILIPPE ET AL, "A genetically engineered human pancreatic beta cell line exhibiting glucose-inducible insulin secretion", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (201109), vol. 121, no. 9, pages 3589 - 3597, XP002689806 [XD] 15-19,36,37 * page 3594 - page 3595; figures 1, 2, 4 * [I] 21-35,38

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/jci58447
 [I]  - PHILIPPE RAVASSARD ET AL, "A New Strategy to Generate Functional Insulin-Producing Cell Lines by Somatic Gene Transfer into Pancreatic Progenitors", PLOS ONE, (20090101), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0004731, ISSN 1932-6203, page e4731, XP055048138 [I] 1-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004731
 [ID]  - NARUSHIMA M ET AL, "A HUMAN BETA.-CELL LINE FOR TRANSPLANTATION THERAPY TO CONTROL TYPE-1 DIABETES", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20051001), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:10.1038/NBT1145, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1274 - 1282, XP008073144 [ID] 1-38 * figures 1, 2, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1145
 [A]  - PECK A B ET AL, "PANCREATIC STEM CELLS: BUILDING, BLOCKS FOR A BETTER SURROGATE ISLET TO TREAT TYPE 1 DIABETES", ANNALS OF MEDICINE, TAYLOR & FRANCIS A B, SE, (20010401), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0785-3890, pages 186 - 192, XP009006630 [A] 1-38 * the whole document *
 [T]  - WEIR GORDON C ET AL, "Finally! A human pancreatic beta cell line", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (201109), vol. 121, no. 9, pages 3395 - 3397, XP002689807 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI58899
by applicantWO2008010200
 WO0138548
 WO2008102000
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual,
    - Oligonucleotide Synthesis,
    - Animal Cell Culture,
    - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.,
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology,
    - PCR: The Polymerase Chain Reaction,
    - PERBAL BERNARD V., A Practical Guide to Molecular Cloning,
    - BARBAS ET AL., Phage Display: A Laboratory Manual,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY,
    - ASFARI, M.; JANJIC, D.; MEDA, P.; LI, G.; HALBAN, P.; WOLHEIM, K., "Establishement of 2-mercaptoethanol-dependent differentiated insulin secreting cell lines", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 130, pages 167 - 178,
    - ATTALI M; STETSYUK V; BASMACIOGULLARI A; AIELLO V; ZANTA-BOUSSIF MA; DUVILLIE B; SCHARFMAN R, "Control of beta-cell differentiation by the pancreatic mesenchyme", DIABETES, (2007), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 1248 - 1258,
    - CASTAING, M.; DUVILLIE, B.; QUEMENEUR, E.; BASMACIOGULLARI, A.; SCHARFMANN, R., "Ex vivo analysis of acinar and endocrine cell development in the human embryonic pancreas", DEV DYN, (2005), vol. 234, pages 339 - 345,
    - CHEN H.; GU X.; SU I.; BOTTINO R.; CONTRERAS J.L.; TARAKHOVSKY A.; KIM S.K., "Polycomb protein Ezh2 regulates pancreatc beta-cell ink4a/arf expression and regeneration in diabetes mellitus", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2011), vol. 23, pages 975 - 985,
    - D'AMOUR, K. A.; BANG, A. G.; ELIAZER, S.; KELLY, O. G.; AGULNICK, A. D.; SMART, N. G.; MOORMAN, M. A.; KROON, E.; CARPENTER, M. K., "Production of pancreatic hormone-expressing endocrine cells from human embryonic stem cells", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2006), vol. 24, pages 1392 - 1401,
    - DE LA TOUR, D.; HALVORSEN, T.; DEMETERCO, C.; TYRBERG, B.; ITKIN-ANSARI, P.; LOY, M.; YOO, S. J.; HAO, E.; BOSSIE, S.; LEVINE, F., "Beta-cell differentiation from a human pancreatic cell line in vitro and in vivo", MOL ENDOCRINOL, (2001), vol. 15, pages 476 - 483,
    - DEMETERCO, C.; ITKIN-ANSARI, P.; TYRBERG, B.; FORD, L. P.; JARVIS, R. A.; LEVINE, F., "c-Myc controls proliferation versus differentiation in human pancreatic endocrine cells", J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2002), vol. 87, pages 3475 - 3485,
    - EFRAT, S.; FUSCO-DEMANE, D.; LEMBERG, H.; EMRAN, 0.; WANG, X., "Conditional transformation of a pancreatic Beta-cell line derived from transgenic mice expressing a tetracycline-regulated oncogene", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 3576 - 3580,
    - EFRAT, S.; LEISER, M.; SURANA, M.; TAL, M.; FUSCO-DEMANE, D.; FLEISCHER, N., "Murine insulinoma cell line with normal glucose-regulated insulin secretion", DIABETES, (1993), vol. 42, pages 901 - 907,
    - EFRAT, S.; LINDE, S.; KOFOD, H.; SPECTOR, D.; DELANNOY, M.; GRANT, S.; HANAHAN, D.; BAEKKESKOV, S., "13 cell lines derived from transgenic mice expressing a hybrid insulin gene-oncogene", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 9037 - 9041,
    - GAZDAR, A.; CHICK, W.; OIE, H.; SIMS, H.; KING, D.; WEIR, G.; LAURIS, V., "Continuous, clonal, insulin- and somatostatin-secreting cell lines established from a transplantable rat islet cell tumor", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 3519 - 3523,
    - GIDEKEL FRIEDLANDER SY; CHU GC; SNYDER EL; GIRNIUS N; DIBELIUS G; CROWLEY D; VASILE E; DEPINHO RA; JACKS T., "Context-dependent transformation of adult pancreatic cells by oncogenic K-Ras", CANCER CELL, (2009), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 379 - 89,
    - GUELI, N.; TOTO, G.; PALMIERI, G.; CARMENINI, G.; DELFINO, A.; FERRINI, U., "In vitro growth of a cell line originated from a human insulinoma", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 4, pages 281 - 285,
    - HANAHAN, D., "Heritable formation of pancreatic beta -cell tumours in transgenic mice expressing recombinant insulin/simian virus 40 oncogenes", NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 115 - 122,
    - HANSSON, M.; TONNING, A.; FRANDSEN, U.; PETRI, A.; RAJAGOPAL, J.; ENGLUND, M. C.; HELLER, R. S.; HAKANSSON, J.; FLECKNER, J.; SKOL, "Artifactual insulin release from differentiated embryonic stem cells", DIABETES, (2004), vol. 53, pages 2603 - 2609,
    - JU, Q.; EDELSTEIN, D.; BRENDEL, M. D.; BRANDHORST, D.; BRANDHORST, H.; BRETZEL, R. G.; BROWNLEE, M., "Transduction of non-dividing adult human pancreatic beta cells by an integrating lentiviral vector", DIABETOLOGIA, (1998), vol. 41, pages 736 - 739,
    - KNAACK, D.; FIORE, D. M.; SURANA, M.; LEISER, M.; LAURANCE, M.; FUSCO-DEMANE, D.; HEGRE, O. D.; FLEISCHER, N.; EFRAT, S., "Clonal insulinoma cell line that stably maintains correct glucose responsiveness", DIABETES, (1994), vol. 43, pages 1413 - 1417,
    - KOHLER; OLEWINSKI M.; TANNAPFEL A.; SCHMIDT W.E.; FRITSCH H.; MEIER J.J. ET AL., "Cell cycle control of beta-cell replication in the prenatal and postnatal human pancreas", AM. J. PHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2010), pages E221 - E230,
    - LEVINE, F.; WANG, S.; BEATTIE, G.; MALLY, M.; CIRULLI, V.; LOPEZ, A.; HAYEK, A., "Development of a cell line from human foetal pancreas", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (1995), vol. 27, page 3410,
    - MEIER JJ.; BUTTLER A.E.; SAISHO Y.; MONCHAMP T.; GALASSO R.; BHUSHAN A.; RIZZA R.A.; BUTLER P.C., "?-cell replication is the primary mechanism subserving the Postnatal Expansion of p-cell mass in humans", DIABETES, (2008), vol. 57, pages 1584 - 1594,
    - MILLER DG; ADAM M.A.; MILLER A.D., "Gene transfer by retrovirus vectors occurs only in cells that are actively replicating at the time of infection", MOL CELL BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 4239 - 4242,
    - MIYAZAKI, J.; ARAKI, K.; YAMATO, E.; IKEGAMI, H.; ASANO, T.; SHIBASAKI, Y.; OKA, Y.; YAMAMURA, K., "Establishment of a pancreatic beta cell line that retains glucose- inducible insulin secretion: special reference to expression of glucose transporter isoforms", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1990), vol. 127, pages 126 - 132,
    - NARUSHIMA, M.; KOBAYASHI, N.; OKITSU, T.; TANAKA, Y.; LI, S. A.; CHEN, Y.; MIKI, A.; TANAKA, K.; NAKAJI, S.; TAKEI, K. ET AL., "A human beta-cell line for transplantation therapy to control type 1 diabetes", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1274 - 1282,
    - RAJAGOPAL, J.; ANDERSON, W. J.; KUME, S.; MARTINEZ, O. I.; MELTON, D. A., "Insulin staining of ES cell progeny from insulin uptake", SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 363,
    - RAVASSARD P; EMILIE BRICOUT-NEVEU; HAZHOUZ Y; PECHBERTY S; MALLET J; CZERNICHOW P; SCHARFMANN R., "A new strategy to generate functional insulin-producing cell lines by somatic gene transfer into pancreatic progenitors", PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, no. 3, page E4731,
    - RAVASSARD P; HAZHOUZ Y; PECHBERTY S; BRICOUT-NEVEU E; ARMANET M; CZERNICHOW P; SCHARFMANN R., "A genetically engineered human pancreatic ? cell line exhibiting glucose-inducible insulin secretion", J CLIN INVEST., (20110901), vol. 121, no. 9, pages 3589 - 97,
    - SANTERRE, R.; COOK, R.; CRISCL, R.; SHARP, J.; SCHIDT, R.; WILLIAMS, D.; WILSON, C., "Insulin synthesis in a clonal cell line of simian virus 40-transformed hamster pancreatic beta cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1981), vol. 78, pages 4339 - 4342,
    - SOLDEVILA, G.; BUSCEMA, M.; MARINI, V.; SUTTON, R.; JAMES, R. F.; BLOOM, S. R.; ROBERTSON, R. P.; MIRAKIAN, R.; PUJOL-BORRELL, R.;, "Transfection with SV40 gene of human pancreatic endocrine cells", JAUTOIMMUN, (1991), vol. 4, pages 381 - 396,
    - SORIA, B.; ROCHE, E.; BERNA, G.; LEON-QUINTO, T.; REIG, J. A.; MARTIN, F., "Insulin-secreting cells derived from embryonic stem cells normalize glycemia in streptozotocin-induced diabetic mice", DIABETES, (2000), vol. 49, pages 157 - 162,
    - ZUFFEREY, R.; NAGY, D.; MANDEL, R. J.; NALDINI, L.; TRONO, D., "Multiply attenuated lentiviral vector achieves efficient gene delivery in vivo", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 871 - 875,