Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2768413

EP2768413 - VARIABLE LOCKING BONE PLATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Trauma, LLC
56 E. Bell Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46581-0587 / US
[2014/35]
Inventor(s)01 / LEUNG, Ross
1015 Carteret Road
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
02 / BERELSMAN, Brian, K.
283 E. Wildwood Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
 [2014/41]
Former [2014/35]01 / LEUNG, Ross
2030 Balboa Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
02 / BERELSMAN, Brian, K.
283 E. Wildwood Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/20]
Former [2014/35]Giles, Ashley Simon
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12781532.212.10.2012
[2016/20]
WO2012US59993
Priority number, dateUS201161547772P17.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161547772 P
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013059090
Date:25.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2768413
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013
[2014/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2768413
Date:18.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80, A61B17/86
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KNOCHENPLATTIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT VARIABLER VERRIEGELUNG[2014/35]
English:VARIABLE LOCKING BONE PLATING SYSTEM[2014/35]
French:SYSTÈME DE PLACAGE D'OS À VERROUILLAGE VARIABLE[2014/35]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/35]
18.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2015Fee for grant paid
30.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.08.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2015
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2012
AL18.05.2016
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU12.10.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
TR18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU12.10.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU12.10.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.10.2012
AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CY18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IS18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MK18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
Former [2017/51]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
Former [2017/40]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
LU12.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT18.05.2016
BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2248479  (GREATBATCH LTD [US]) [A] 1-54 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0028]; figure 8 *;
 [A]WO2011076205  (MERETE MEDICAL GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 5, line 18 - line 6 * * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 6; figures 7a, 7b * * page 18, line 8 - page 19, line 6; figure 8 *
by applicantDE4343117